MI HB4359 | 2021-2022 | 101st Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 15-6)
Status: Passed on July 14 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-14 - Assigned Pa 53'21 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Health occupations: nurses; scope of practice of registered professional nurse holding a specialty certification as a nurse anesthetist; modify. Amends secs. 17210 & 17708 of 1978 PA 368 (MCL 333.17210 & 333.17708)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Health occupations: nurses; scope of practice of registered professional nurse holding a specialty certification as a nurse anesthetist; modify. Amends secs. 17210 & 17708 of 1978 PA 368 (MCL 333.17210 & 333.17708)

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-06-24 - House - House Third Reading: Roll Call # 393 (Y: 96 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-24 - House - House Third Reading: Roll Call # 389 (Y: 95 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-24 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 321 (Y: 31 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-06-17 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 289 (Y: 31 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-06-15 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-3 (Y: 7 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-24 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 81 (Y: 82 N: 25 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-10 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 14 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-07-14HouseAssigned Pa 53'21 With Immediate Effect
2021-07-14HouseFiled With Secretary Of State 07/13/2021 04:30 Pm
2021-07-14HouseApproved By The Governor 07/13/2021 10:08 Am
2021-06-30HousePresented To The Governor 06/30/2021 02:04 Pm
2021-06-24HouseBill Ordered Enrolled
2021-06-24HouseRoll Call Roll Call # 393 Yeas 96 Nays 12 Excused 0 Not Voting 2
2021-06-24HouseSenate Substitute (s-4) Concurred In
2021-06-24HouseVote On Concurring Reconsidered
2021-06-24HouseEnrollment Vacated
2021-06-24HouseBill Ordered Enrolled
2021-06-24HouseFull Title Agreed To
2021-06-24HouseRoll Call Roll Call # 389 Yeas 95 Nays 13 Excused 0 Not Voting 2
2021-06-24HouseSenate Substitute (s-4) Concurred In
2021-06-24HouseRule Suspended
2021-06-24HouseLaid Over One Day Under The Rules
2021-06-24HouseReturned From Senate With Substitute (s-4) With Immediate Effect And Full Title
2021-06-24SenatePassed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 321 Yeas 31 Nays 4 Excused 1 Not Voting 0
2021-06-24SenateAmendment(s) Adopted
2021-06-24SenateVote Reconsidered
2021-06-24HouseRetransmitted
2021-06-24HouseRequest Granted
2021-06-24HouseSenate Requests Return
2021-06-24SenateSenate Requests Return
2021-06-17HouseLaid Over One Day Under The Rules
2021-06-17HouseReturned From Senate With Substitute (s-4) With Full Title
2021-06-17SenateInserted Full Title
2021-06-17SenatePassed Roll Call # 289 Yeas 31 Nays 4 Excused 1 Not Voting 0
2021-06-17SenateAmendment(s) Adopted
2021-06-17SenatePostponed Temporarily
2021-06-17SenatePlaced On Immediate Passage
2021-06-17SenateRules Suspended
2021-06-17SenatePlaced On Order Of Third Reading With Substitute (s-4)
2021-06-17SenateSubstitute (s-4) Concurred In
2021-06-17SenateReported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably With Substitute (s-4)
2021-06-15SenateReferred To Committee Of The Whole With Substitute (s-3)
2021-06-15SenateReported Favorably With Substitute (s-3)
2021-03-25SenateReferred To Committee On Health Policy And Human Services
2021-03-24HouseTransmitted
2021-03-24HousePassed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 81 Yeas 82 Nays 25 Excused 0 Not Voting 3
2021-03-24HouseRead A Third Time
2021-03-23HousePlaced On Third Reading
2021-03-23HouseRead A Second Time
2021-03-10HouseReferred To Second Reading
2021-03-10HouseReported With Recommendation Without Amendment
2021-02-25HouseBill Electronically Reproduced 02/24/2021
2021-02-24HouseReferred To Committee On Health Policy
2021-02-24HouseRead A First Time
2021-02-24HouseIntroduced By Representative Mary Whiteford

Subjects


Michigan State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://legislature.mi.gov/doc.aspx?2021-HB-4359
Texthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2021-2022/billintroduced/House/htm/2021-HIB-4359.htm
Texthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2021-2022/billengrossed/House/htm/2021-HEBH-4359.htm
Texthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2021-2022/billengrossed/House/htm/2021-HEBS-4359.htm
Texthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2021-2022/billenrolled/House/htm/2021-HNB-4359.htm
Texthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2021-2022/publicact/htm/2021-PA-0053.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/mileg.aspx?page=CurrentVersionAmendment&cvFileName=2021-HCVBS-4359-00B715.pdf
Amendmenthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/mileg.aspx?page=CurrentVersionAmendment&cvFileName=2021-HCVBS-4359-00C717.pdf
Supplementhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2021-2022/billanalysis/House/pdf/2021-HLA-4359-28916A4E.pdf
Supplementhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2021-2022/billanalysis/House/pdf/2021-HLA-4359-BA246F62.pdf
Supplementhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2021-2022/billanalysis/House/pdf/2021-HLA-4359-CB0B5939.pdf
Supplementhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2021-2022/billanalysis/Senate/pdf/2021-SFA-4359-L.pdf
Supplementhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2021-2022/billanalysis/Senate/pdf/2021-SFA-4359-F.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2021-2022/Journal/House/htm/2021-HJ-03-10-021.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2021-2022/Journal/House/htm/2021-HJ-03-24-027.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2021-2022/Journal/Senate/htm/2021-SJ-06-15-055.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2021-2022/Journal/Senate/htm/2021-SJ-06-17-057.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2021-2022/Journal/Senate/htm/2021-SJ-06-24-059.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2021-2022/Journal/House/htm/2021-HJ-06-24-061.htm

Bill Comments

feedback