MI HB4351 | 2017-2018 | 99th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Vetoed on November 8 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-11-08 - Re-referred To Committee On Tax Policy
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on November 8 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-11-08 - Re-referred To Committee On Tax Policy
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Sales tax; exemptions; purchase of certain aviation equipment; exempt. Amends sec. 4x of 1933 PA 167 (MCL 205.54x).
Title
Sales tax; exemptions; purchase of certain aviation equipment; exempt. Amends sec. 4x of 1933 PA 167 (MCL 205.54x).
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-09-26 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 562 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-10-05 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-25 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 144 (Y: 70 N: 38 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-29 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 (Y: 8 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-10-05 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-25 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 144 (Y: 70 N: 38 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-29 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 (Y: 8 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-11-08 | House | Re-referred To Committee On Tax Policy |
2018-11-08 | House | Vetoed By The Governor 10/16/2018 |
2018-10-04 | House | Presented To The Governor 10/4/2018 @ 10:10 Am |
2018-09-27 | House | Bill Ordered Enrolled |
2018-09-27 | House | Full Title Agreed To |
2018-09-27 | House | Returned From Senate Without Amendment With Immediate Effect And Full Title |
2018-09-26 | Senate | Inserted Full Title |
2018-09-26 | Senate | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 562 Yeas 36 Nays 0 Excused 1 Not Voting 0 |
2018-01-25 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading |
2018-01-25 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably Without Amendment(s) |
2017-10-05 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole |
2017-10-05 | Senate | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect |
2017-10-05 | Senate | Reported Favorably Without Amendment |
2017-05-30 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Finance |
2017-05-25 | House | Transmitted |
2017-05-25 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 144 Yeas 70 Nays 38 |
2017-05-25 | House | Read A Third Time |
2017-05-24 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2017-05-24 | House | Substitute H-1 Adopted |
2017-05-24 | House | Read A Second Time |
2017-03-29 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2017-03-29 | House | Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 |
2017-03-15 | House | Bill Electronically Reproduced 03/14/2017 |
2017-03-14 | House | Referred To Committee On Tax Policy |
2017-03-14 | House | Read A First Time |
2017-03-14 | House | Introduced By Representative Bronna Kahle |