MI HB4350 | 2021-2022 | 101st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 15-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 24 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-25 - Referred To Committee On Health Policy And Human Services
Pending: Senate Health Policy And Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 24 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-25 - Referred To Committee On Health Policy And Human Services
Pending: Senate Health Policy And Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Health: pharmaceuticals; health care false claim act; modify exemption from criminal liability to exclude manufacturers of prescription drugs from providing discounts under certain circumstances. Amends secs. 2 & 4a of 1984 PA 323 (MCL 752.1002 & 752.1004a).
Title
Health: pharmaceuticals; health care false claim act; modify exemption from criminal liability to exclude manufacturers of prescription drugs from providing discounts under certain circumstances. Amends secs. 2 & 4a of 1984 PA 323 (MCL 752.1002 & 752.1004a).
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-24 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 71 (Y: 101 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-17 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-3 (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-17 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-3 (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-25 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Health Policy And Human Services |
2021-03-24 | House | Transmitted |
2021-03-24 | House | Title Amended |
2021-03-24 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 71 Yeas 101 Nays 6 Excused 0 Not Voting 3 |
2021-03-24 | House | Read A Third Time |
2021-03-23 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2021-03-23 | House | Substitute (h-5) Adopted |
2021-03-23 | House | Substitute (h-3) Not Adopted |
2021-03-17 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2021-03-17 | House | Reported With Recommendation With Substitute (h-3) |
2021-02-25 | House | Bill Electronically Reproduced 02/24/2021 |
2021-02-24 | House | Referred To Committee On Health Policy |
2021-02-24 | House | Read A First Time |
2021-02-24 | House | Introduced By Representative Stephanie Young |