MI HB4349 | 2021-2022 | 101st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 13-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 24 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-25 - Referred To Committee On Health Policy And Human Services
Pending: Senate Health Policy And Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 24 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-25 - Referred To Committee On Health Policy And Human Services
Pending: Senate Health Policy And Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Health facilities: hospitals; list of standard charges for certain items and services; make available to the public pursuant to federal law. Amends 1978 PA 368 (MCL 333.1101 - 333.25211) by adding sec. 21517.
Title
Health facilities: hospitals; list of standard charges for certain items and services; make available to the public pursuant to federal law. Amends 1978 PA 368 (MCL 333.1101 - 333.25211) by adding sec. 21517.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-24 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 84 (Y: 104 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-18 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-18 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-25 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Health Policy And Human Services |
2021-03-24 | House | Transmitted |
2021-03-24 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 84 Yeas 104 Nays 3 Excused 0 Not Voting 3 |
2021-03-24 | House | Read A Third Time |
2021-03-23 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2021-03-23 | House | Read A Second Time |
2021-03-18 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2021-03-18 | House | Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment |
2021-02-25 | House | Bill Electronically Reproduced 02/24/2021 |
2021-02-24 | House | Referred To Committee On Health Policy |
2021-02-24 | House | Read A First Time |
2021-02-24 | House | Introduced By Representative Ryan Berman |