MI HB4347 | 2015-2016 | 98th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 14-2)
Status: Introduced on March 17 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-01-14 - Referred To Committee On Government Operations
Pending: House Government Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 17 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-01-14 - Referred To Committee On Government Operations
Pending: House Government Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Holidays; other; "Blue Star Mothers Day"; designate as February 1. Creates new act.
Title
Holidays; other; "Blue Star Mothers Day"; designate as February 1. Creates new act.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-10-29 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-01-14 | House | Referred To Committee On Government Operations |
2015-10-29 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2015-10-29 | House | Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment |
2015-03-18 | House | Printed Bill Filed 03/18/2015 |
2015-03-17 | House | Referred To Committee On Military And Veterans Affairs |
2015-03-17 | House | Read A First Time |
2015-03-17 | House | Introduced By Representative Tom Barrett |
Same As/Similar To
SB0222 (Same As) 2015-05-05 - Referred To Committee Of The Whole