MI HB4335 | 2019-2020 | 100th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on February 6 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-02-06 - Assigned Pa 27'20 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on February 6 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-02-06 - Assigned Pa 27'20 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Occupations; barbers; education and training requirements for cosmetology and barber licensing; revise. Amends secs. 1110 & 1205 of 1980 PA 299 (MCL 339.1110 & 339.1205).
Title
Occupations; barbers; education and training requirements for cosmetology and barber licensing; revise. Amends secs. 1110 & 1205 of 1980 PA 299 (MCL 339.1110 & 339.1205).
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-01-22 - House - House Third Reading: Roll Call # 28 (Y: 106 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-21 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 16 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-12-11 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-10-29 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 287 (Y: 109 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-10-16 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-15 - House - Reported With Recommendation For Referral To Committee On Ways And Means (Y: 13 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-21 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 16 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-12-11 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-10-29 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 287 (Y: 109 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-10-16 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-15 - House - Reported With Recommendation For Referral To Committee On Ways And Means (Y: 13 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-06 | House | Assigned Pa 27'20 With Immediate Effect |
2020-02-06 | House | Filed With Secretary Of State 02/04/2020 02:06 Pm |
2020-02-06 | House | Approved By The Governor 02/04/2020 11:15 Am |
2020-01-28 | House | Presented To The Governor 01/27/2020 09:10 Am |
2020-01-22 | House | Bill Ordered Enrolled |
2020-01-22 | House | Full Title Agreed To |
2020-01-22 | House | Roll Call Roll Call # 28 Yeas 106 Nays 0 Excused 0 Not Voting 3 |
2020-01-22 | House | Senate Substitute (s-1) Concurred In |
2020-01-21 | House | Laid Over One Day Under The Rules |
2020-01-21 | House | Returned From Senate With Substitute (s-1) With Immediate Effect And Full Title |
2020-01-21 | Senate | Inserted Full Title |
2020-01-21 | Senate | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 16 Yeas 38 Nays 0 Excused 0 Not Voting 0 |
2020-01-16 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading With Substitute (s-1) |
2020-01-16 | Senate | Substitute (s-1) Concurred In |
2020-01-16 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably With Substitute (s-1) |
2019-12-11 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole With Substitute (s-1) |
2019-12-11 | Senate | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect |
2019-12-11 | Senate | Reported Favorably With Substitute (s-1) |
2019-10-30 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Regulatory Reform |
2019-10-29 | House | Transmitted |
2019-10-29 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 287 Yeas 109 Nays 0 Excused 0 Not Voting 1 |
2019-10-29 | House | Read A Third Time |
2019-10-24 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2019-10-24 | House | Substitute (h-1) Adopted |
2019-10-24 | House | Read A Second Time |
2019-10-16 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2019-10-16 | House | Reported With Recommendation With Substitute (h-1) |
2019-05-15 | House | Referred To Committee On Ways And Means |
2019-03-13 | House | Bill Electronically Reproduced 03/12/2019 |
2019-03-12 | House | Referred To Committee On Regulatory Reform |
2019-03-12 | House | Read A First Time |
2019-03-12 | House | Introduced By Representative Jeff Yaroch |
Subjects
Occupations: barbers
Occupations: cosmetologists
Occupations: individual licensing and registration
State agencies (existing): licensing and regulatory affairs
Occupations: cosmetologists
Occupations: individual licensing and registration
State agencies (existing): licensing and regulatory affairs