MI HB4332 | 2019-2020 | 100th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 24-2)
Status: Vetoed on October 14 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-10-14 - Vetoed By The Governor 10/15/2020
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Natural resources: hunting; use of pneumatic airbows in certain hunting seasons; allow. Amends secs. 40102, 40103 & 40114 of 1994 PA 451 (MCL 324.40102 et seq.) & adds sec. 40111d.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Natural resources: hunting; use of pneumatic airbows in certain hunting seasons; allow. Amends secs. 40102, 40103 & 40114 of 1994 PA 451 (MCL 324.40102 et seq.) & adds sec. 40111d.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-09-30 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 360 (Y: 23 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-09-10 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-12 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 154 (Y: 70 N: 37 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-03 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-10-14HouseVetoed By The Governor 10/15/2020
2020-10-01HousePresented To The Governor 10/05/2020 03:26 Pm
2020-09-30HouseBill Ordered Enrolled
2020-09-30HouseFull Title Agreed To
2020-09-30HouseReturned From Senate Without Amendment With Full Title
2020-09-30SenateInserted Full Title
2020-09-30SenateImmediate Effect Defeated
2020-09-30SenatePassed Roll Call # 360 Yeas 23 Nays 15 Excused 0 Not Voting 0
2020-09-29SenatePlaced On Order Of Third Reading
2020-09-29SenateReported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably Without Amendment(s)
2020-09-10SenateReferred To Committee Of The Whole
2020-09-10SenateCommittee Recommended Immediate Effect
2020-09-10SenateReported Favorably Without Amendment
2020-03-17SenateReferred To Committee On Natural Resources
2020-03-12HouseTransmitted
2020-03-12HousePassed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 154 Yeas 70 Nays 37 Excused 0 Not Voting 2
2020-03-12HouseRead A Third Time
2020-03-11HousePlaced On Third Reading
2020-03-11HouseSubstitute (h-1) Adopted
2020-03-11HouseRead A Second Time
2020-03-03HouseReferred To Second Reading
2020-03-03HouseReported With Recommendation With Substitute (h-1)
2019-10-29HouseReferred To Committee On Judiciary, With Substitute (h-1)
2019-03-12HouseBill Electronically Reproduced 03/12/2019
2019-03-12HouseReferred To Committee On Natural Resources And Outdoor Recreation
2019-03-12HouseRead A First Time
2019-03-12HouseIntroduced By Representative Beau Lafave

Subjects


Michigan State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://legislature.mi.gov/doc.aspx?2019-HB-4332
Texthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2019-2020/billintroduced/House/htm/2019-HIB-4332.htm
Texthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2019-2020/billengrossed/House/htm/2019-HEBH-4332.htm
Texthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2019-2020/billengrossed/House/htm/2019-HEBS-4332.htm
Texthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2019-2020/billenrolled/House/htm/2019-HNB-4332.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2019-2020/Journal/House/htm/2020-HJ-03-03-023.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2019-2020/Journal/House/htm/2020-HJ-03-12-028.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2019-2020/Journal/Senate/htm/2020-SJ-09-10-068.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2019-2020/Journal/Senate/htm/2020-SJ-09-30-075.htm

Bill Comments

feedback