MI HB4327 | 2017-2018 | 99th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 7 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2017-09-20 - Placed On Third Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Education; public school academies; geographic preference for charter school enrollment for low-income pupils; allow. Amends secs. 504, 524 & 556 of 1976 PA 451 (MCL 380.504 et seq.).

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Education; public school academies; geographic preference for charter school enrollment for low-income pupils; allow. Amends secs. 504, 524 & 556 of 1976 PA 451 (MCL 380.504 et seq.).

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-05-18 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-3 (Y: 14 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-09-20HousePlaced On Third Reading
2017-09-20HouseSubstitute H-3 Adopted
2017-09-20HouseRead A Second Time
2017-05-18HouseReferred To Second Reading
2017-05-18HouseReported With Recommendation With Substitute H-3
2017-03-08HouseBill Electronically Reproduced 03/07/2017
2017-03-07HouseReferred To Committee On Education Reform
2017-03-07HouseRead A First Time
2017-03-07HouseIntroduced By Representative Stephanie Chang

Subjects


Michigan State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback