MI HB4326 | 2021-2022 | 101st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 18 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-05-12 - Placed On Order Of Third Reading With Substitute (s-1)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 18 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-05-12 - Placed On Order Of Third Reading With Substitute (s-1)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Education: curriculum; merit curriculum requirement; modify. Amends sec. 1278a of 1976 PA 451 (MCL 380.1278a).
Title
Education: curriculum; merit curriculum requirement; modify. Amends sec. 1278a of 1976 PA 451 (MCL 380.1278a).
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-09 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-18 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 209 (Y: 59 N: 49 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-16 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 8 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-18 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 209 (Y: 59 N: 49 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-16 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 8 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-12 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading With Substitute (s-1) |
2022-05-12 | Senate | Substitute (s-1) Concurred In |
2022-05-12 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably With Substitute (s-1) |
2022-03-09 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole With Substitute (s-1) |
2022-03-09 | Senate | Reported Favorably With Substitute (s-1) |
2021-05-19 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Education And Career Readiness |
2021-05-18 | House | Transmitted |
2021-05-18 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 209 Yeas 59 Nays 49 Excused 0 Not Voting 2 |
2021-05-18 | House | Read A Third Time |
2021-05-13 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2021-05-13 | House | Read A Second Time |
2021-03-16 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2021-03-16 | House | Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment |
2021-02-25 | House | Bill Electronically Reproduced 02/24/2021 |
2021-02-24 | House | Referred To Committee On Education |
2021-02-24 | House | Read A First Time |
2021-02-24 | House | Introduced By Representative Greg Vanwoerkom |