MI HB4326 | 2011-2012 | 96th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 13-0)
Status: Vetoed on December 6 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-12-06 - Re-referred To Committee On Regulatory Reform
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on December 6 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-12-06 - Re-referred To Committee On Regulatory Reform
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Administrative procedure; rules; adoption of rules by state agencies; prohibit from being more stringent than federal regulations. Amends sec. 32 of 1969 PA 306 (MCL 24.232).
Title
Administrative procedure; rules; adoption of rules by state agencies; prohibit from being more stringent than federal regulations. Amends sec. 32 of 1969 PA 306 (MCL 24.232).
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-11-10 - House - House Third Reading: Roll Call # 486 (Y: 59 N: 48 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-11-10 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 685 (Y: 25 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2011-11-03 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-06-16 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 200 (Y: 60 N: 48 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-25 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-2 (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-11-10 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 685 (Y: 25 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2011-11-03 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-06-16 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 200 (Y: 60 N: 48 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-25 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-2 (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-12-06 | House | Re-referred To Committee On Regulatory Reform |
2011-12-06 | House | Vetoed By The Governor 11/30/2011 |
2011-11-29 | House | Presented To The Governor 11/18/2011 @ 9:44 Am |
2011-11-10 | House | Bill Ordered Enrolled |
2011-11-10 | House | Full Title Agreed To |
2011-11-10 | House | Roll Call # 486 Yeas 59 Nays 48 |
2011-11-10 | House | Senate Substitute S-1 Concurred In |
2011-11-10 | House | Rule Suspended |
2011-11-10 | House | Laid Over One Day Under The Rules |
2011-11-10 | House | Returned From Senate With Substitute S-1 With Immediate Effect And Full Title |
2011-11-10 | Senate | Inserted Full Title |
2011-11-10 | Senate | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 685 Yeas 25 Nays 11 Excused 2 Not Voting 0 |
2011-11-09 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading With Substitute S-1 |
2011-11-09 | Senate | Substitute S-1 Concurred In |
2011-11-09 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably With Substitute S-1 |
2011-11-03 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole |
2011-11-03 | Senate | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect |
2011-11-03 | Senate | Reported Favorably Without Amendment |
2011-06-21 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Economic Development |
2011-06-16 | House | Transmitted |
2011-06-16 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 200 Yeas 60 Nays 48 |
2011-06-16 | House | Read A Third Time |
2011-06-15 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2011-06-15 | House | Substitute H-2 Adopted |
2011-06-15 | House | Read A Second Time |
2011-05-25 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2011-05-25 | House | Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-2 |
2011-02-24 | House | Printed Bill Filed 02/24/2011 |
2011-02-23 | House | Referred To Committee On Regulatory Reform |
2011-02-23 | House | Read A First Time |
2011-02-23 | House | Introduced By Representative Jeff Farrington |
Subjects
Administrative procedure, rules
Administrative procedure, state office of administrative hearings and rules
Legislature, other
State agencies (existing), generally
Administrative procedure, state office of administrative hearings and rules
Legislature, other
State agencies (existing), generally