MI HB4323 | 2019-2020 | 100th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 31 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-12-31 - Assigned Pa 150'19 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Crimes; gambling; internet gaming under lawful internet gaming act; allow. Amends 1931 PA 328 (MCL 750.1 - 750.568) by adding sec. 310d. TIE BAR WITH: HB 4311'19

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Crimes; gambling; internet gaming under lawful internet gaming act; allow. Amends 1931 PA 328 (MCL 750.1 - 750.568) by adding sec. 310d. TIE BAR WITH: HB 4311'19

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-12-11 - House - House Third Reading: Roll Call # 363 (Y: 98 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-12-11 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 357 (Y: 35 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-12-11 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-10-30 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 296 (Y: 64 N: 43 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-10-29 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-19 - House - Reported With Recommendation For Referral To Committee On Ways And Means (Y: 13 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-12-31HouseAssigned Pa 150'19 With Immediate Effect
2019-12-31HouseFiled With Secretary Of State 12/20/2019 10:44 Am
2019-12-31HouseApproved By The Governor 12/20/2019 10:24 Am
2019-12-19HousePresented To The Governor 12/13/2019 03:05 Pm
2019-12-11HouseBill Ordered Enrolled
2019-12-11HouseFull Title Agreed To
2019-12-11HouseRoll Call Roll Call # 363 Yeas 97 Nays 11 Excused 0 Not Voting 1
2019-12-11HouseSenate Substitute (s-1) Concurred In
2019-12-11HouseRule Suspended
2019-12-11HouseLaid Over One Day Under The Rules
2019-12-11HouseReturned From Senate With Substitute (s-1) With Immediate Effect And Full Title
2019-12-11SenateInserted Full Title
2019-12-11SenatePassed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 357 Yeas 35 Nays 3 Excused 0 Not Voting 0
2019-12-11SenatePlaced On Immediate Passage
2019-12-11SenateRules Suspended
2019-12-11SenatePlaced On Order Of Third Reading With Substitute (s-1)
2019-12-11SenateSubstitute (s-1) Concurred In
2019-12-11SenateReported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably With Substitute (s-1)
2019-12-11SenateReferred To Committee Of The Whole With Substitute (s-1)
2019-12-11SenateCommittee Recommended Immediate Effect
2019-12-11SenateReported Favorably With Substitute (s-1)
2019-11-05SenateReferred To Committee On Regulatory Reform
2019-10-30HouseTransmitted
2019-10-30HousePassed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 296 Yeas 64 Nays 43 Excused 0 Not Voting 3
2019-10-30HouseRead A Third Time
2019-10-30HousePlaced On Immediate Passage
2019-10-30HousePlaced On Third Reading
2019-10-30HouseRead A Second Time
2019-10-29HouseReferred To Second Reading
2019-10-29HouseReported With Recommendation Without Amendment
2019-03-19HouseReferred To Committee On Ways And Means
2019-03-13HouseBill Electronically Reproduced 03/12/2019
2019-03-12HouseReferred To Committee On Regulatory Reform
2019-03-12HouseRead A First Time
2019-03-12HouseIntroduced By Representative Latanya Garrett

Subjects


Michigan State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://legislature.mi.gov/doc.aspx?2019-HB-4323
Texthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2019-2020/billintroduced/House/htm/2019-HIB-4323.htm
Texthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2019-2020/billengrossed/House/htm/2019-HEBH-4323.htm
Texthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2019-2020/billengrossed/House/htm/2019-HEBS-4323.htm
Texthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2019-2020/billenrolled/House/htm/2019-HNB-4323.htm
Texthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2019-2020/publicact/htm/2019-PA-0150.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2019-2020/Journal/House/htm/2019-HJ-03-19-028.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2019-2020/Journal/House/htm/2019-HJ-10-29-102.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2019-2020/Journal/House/htm/2019-HJ-10-30-103.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2019-2020/Journal/Senate/htm/2019-SJ-12-11-115.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2019-2020/Journal/House/htm/2019-HJ-12-11-114.htm

Bill Comments

feedback