MI HB4318 | 2023-2024 | 102nd Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on August 22 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-08-22 - Assigned Pa 109'23 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on August 22 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-08-22 - Assigned Pa 109'23 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Property tax: payment in lieu of taxes; payment in lieu of taxes for renewable energy facilities; provide for. Amends secs. 9 & 9f of 1893 PA 206 (MCL 211.9 & 211.9f). TIE BAR WITH: HB 4317'23
Title
Property tax: payment in lieu of taxes; payment in lieu of taxes for renewable energy facilities; provide for. Amends secs. 9 & 9f of 1893 PA 206 (MCL 211.9 & 211.9f). TIE BAR WITH: HB 4317'23
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-06-28 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 419 (Y: 27 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-06-27 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-06-22 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 221 (Y: 92 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-06-21 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 11 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-06-27 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-06-22 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 221 (Y: 92 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-06-21 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 11 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-08-22 | House | Assigned Pa 109'23 With Immediate Effect |
2023-08-22 | House | Filed With Secretary Of State 07/27/2023 09:50 Am |
2023-08-22 | House | Approved By The Governor 07/26/2023 12:02 Pm |
2023-07-18 | House | Presented To The Governor 07/17/2023 11:27 Am |
2023-06-28 | House | Bill Ordered Enrolled |
2023-06-28 | House | Full Title Agreed To |
2023-06-28 | House | Returned From Senate Without Amendment With Immediate Effect And Full Title |
2023-06-28 | Senate | Inserted Full Title |
2023-06-28 | Senate | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 419 Yeas 27 Nays 10 Excused 1 Not Voting 0 |
2023-06-27 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading |
2023-06-27 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably Without Amendment(s) |
2023-06-27 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole |
2023-06-27 | Senate | Reported Favorably Without Amendment |
2023-06-27 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Energy And Environment |
2023-06-22 | House | Transmitted |
2023-06-22 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 221 Yeas 92 Nays 17 Excused 0 Not Voting 1 |
2023-06-22 | House | Read A Third Time |
2023-06-21 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2023-06-21 | House | Read A Second Time |
2023-06-21 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2023-06-21 | House | Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment |
2023-03-23 | House | Bill Electronically Reproduced 03/22/2023 |
2023-03-22 | House | Referred To Committee On Tax Policy |
2023-03-22 | House | Read A First Time |
2023-03-22 | House | Introduced By Representative Cynthia Neeley |
Same As/Similar To
HB4317 (Same As) 2023-08-22 - Assigned Pa 108'23 With Immediate Effect