MI HB4309 | 2019-2020 | 100th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on January 28 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-01-28 - Assigned Pa 14'20 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on January 28 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-01-28 - Assigned Pa 14'20 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Criminal procedure: sentencing guidelines; guidelines for violation of the fantasy contests consumer protection act; enact. Amends sec. 14d, ch. XVII of 1927 PA 175 (MCL 777.14d).
Title
Criminal procedure: sentencing guidelines; guidelines for violation of the fantasy contests consumer protection act; enact. Amends sec. 14d, ch. XVII of 1927 PA 175 (MCL 777.14d).
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-01-14 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Roll Call: Roll Call # 8 (Y: 33 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-08 - House - House Third Reading: Roll Call # 2 (Y: 95 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-12-11 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 353 (Y: 35 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-12-11 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-10-30 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 291 (Y: 67 N: 41 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-10-29 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-19 - House - Reported With Recommendation For Referral To Committee On Ways And Means (Y: 13 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-08 - House - House Third Reading: Roll Call # 2 (Y: 95 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-12-11 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 353 (Y: 35 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-12-11 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-10-30 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 291 (Y: 67 N: 41 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-10-29 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-19 - House - Reported With Recommendation For Referral To Committee On Ways And Means (Y: 13 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-28 | House | Assigned Pa 14'20 With Immediate Effect |
2020-01-28 | House | Filed With Secretary Of State 01/27/2020 03:20 Pm |
2020-01-28 | House | Approved By The Governor 01/27/2020 01:49 Pm |
2020-01-16 | House | Presented To The Governor 01/16/2020 11:48 Am |
2020-01-14 | House | Bill Ordered Enrolled |
2020-01-14 | House | Re-returned From Senate With Concurrence To House Substitute (s-1) To Senate Substitute (h-3) |
2020-01-14 | Senate | Title Amendment Agreed To |
2020-01-14 | Senate | Roll Call: Roll Call # 8 Yeas 33 Nays 5 Excused 0 Not Voting 0 |
2020-01-14 | Senate | House Substitute (h-3) Concurred In |
2020-01-09 | Senate | Laid Over One Day Under The Rules |
2020-01-09 | Senate | Returned From House With Substitute (h-3) To Senate Substitute (s-1) |
2020-01-08 | House | Retransmitted |
2020-01-08 | House | Title Amended |
2020-01-08 | House | Roll Call Roll Call # 2 Yeas 95 Nays 12 Excused 0 Not Voting 2 |
2020-01-08 | House | Senate Substitute (s-1) Concurred In As Substituted (h-3) |
2020-01-08 | House | Substitute (h-3) Adopted |
2019-12-11 | House | Laid Over One Day Under The Rules |
2019-12-11 | House | Returned From Senate With Substitute (s-1) With Immediate Effect And Full Title |
2019-12-11 | Senate | Inserted Full Title |
2019-12-11 | Senate | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 353 Yeas 35 Nays 3 Excused 0 Not Voting 0 |
2019-12-11 | Senate | Placed On Immediate Passage |
2019-12-11 | Senate | Rules Suspended |
2019-12-11 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading With Substitute (s-1) |
2019-12-11 | Senate | Substitute (s-1) Concurred In |
2019-12-11 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably With Substitute (s-1) |
2019-12-11 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole With Substitute (s-1) |
2019-12-11 | Senate | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect |
2019-12-11 | Senate | Reported Favorably With Substitute (s-1) |
2019-11-05 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Regulatory Reform |
2019-10-30 | House | Transmitted |
2019-10-30 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 291 Yeas 67 Nays 41 Excused 0 Not Voting 2 |
2019-10-30 | House | Read A Third Time |
2019-10-30 | House | Placed On Immediate Passage |
2019-10-30 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2019-10-30 | House | Read A Second Time |
2019-10-29 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2019-10-29 | House | Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment |
2019-03-19 | House | Referred To Committee On Ways And Means |
2019-03-12 | House | Bill Electronically Reproduced 03/07/2019 |
2019-03-07 | House | Referred To Committee On Regulatory Reform |
2019-03-07 | House | Read A First Time |
2019-03-07 | House | Introduced By Representative Michael Webber |