MI HB4307 | 2019-2020 | 100th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 7 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-03-19 - Reported With Recommendation For Referral To Committee On Ways And Means
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Gaming; casinos; general amendments to the Michigan gaming control and revenue act; provide for. Amends secs. 2, 4, 4a, 4c, 4d, 5, 6, 6a, 6c, 7a, 7c, 8, 9, 9a, 9b, 9c, 12, 12a, 14, 18, 21 & 25 of 1996 IL 1 (MCL 432.202 et seq.) & repeals secs. 7b, 8a & 10 of 1996 IL 1 (MCL 432.207b et seq.). TIE BAR WITH: HB 4311'19

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Gaming; casinos; general amendments to the Michigan gaming control and revenue act; provide for. Amends secs. 2, 4, 4a, 4c, 4d, 5, 6, 6a, 6c, 7a, 7c, 8, 9, 9a, 9b, 9c, 12, 12a, 14, 18, 21 & 25 of 1996 IL 1 (MCL 432.202 et seq.) & repeals secs. 7b, 8a & 10 of 1996 IL 1 (MCL 432.207b et seq.). TIE BAR WITH: HB 4311'19

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-19 - House - Reported With Recommendation For Referral To Committee On Ways And Means (Y: 14 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-19HouseReported With Recommendation For Referral To Committee On Ways And Means
2019-03-12HouseBill Electronically Reproduced 03/07/2019
2019-03-07HouseReferred To Committee On Regulatory Reform
2019-03-07HouseRead A First Time
2019-03-07HouseIntroduced By Representative Brandt Iden

Subjects


Michigan State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback