MI HB4303 | 2019-2020 | 100th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 7 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-11-13 - Referred To Committee On Ways And Means, With Substitute (h-2)
Pending: House Ways And Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

State; other; participation in daylight savings time; eliminate. Creates new act.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

State; other; participation in daylight savings time; eliminate. Creates new act.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-11-13HouseReferred To Committee On Ways And Means, With Substitute (h-2)
2019-03-12HouseBill Electronically Reproduced 03/07/2019
2019-03-07HouseReferred To Committee On Commerce And Tourism
2019-03-07HouseRead A First Time
2019-03-07HouseIntroduced By Representative Michele Hoitenga

Subjects


Michigan State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback