MI HB4294 | 2023-2024 | 102nd Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-0)
Status: Passed on September 19 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-09-19 - Assigned Pa 121'23 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Family law: marriage and divorce; minimum age of consent for marriage; establish at 18. Amends sec. 3 of 1887 PA 128 (MCL 551.103). TIE BAR WITH: SB 0209'23, SB 0212'23, HB 4295'23, HB 4296'23

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Family law: marriage and divorce; minimum age of consent for marriage; establish at 18. Amends sec. 3 of 1887 PA 128 (MCL 551.103). TIE BAR WITH: SB 0209'23, SB 0212'23, HB 4295'23, HB 4296'23

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2023-09-06 - House - House Third Reading: Roll Call # 272 (Y: 99 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-06-28 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 427 (Y: 31 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-06-27 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 392 (Y: 31 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-06-21 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 184 (Y: 98 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-17 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2023-09-19HouseAssigned Pa 121'23 With Immediate Effect
2023-09-19HouseFiled With Secretary Of State 09/19/2023 10:02 Am
2023-09-19HouseApproved By The Governor 09/18/2023 04:52 Pm
2023-09-07HousePresented To The Governor 09/11/2023 11:18 Am
2023-09-06HouseBill Ordered Enrolled
2023-09-06HouseRoll Call Roll Call # 272 Yeas 99 Nays 8 Excused 0 Not Voting 3
2023-09-06HouseSenate Substitute (s-1) Concurred In
2023-06-28HouseLaid Over One Day Under The Rules
2023-06-28HouseReturned From Senate With Substitute (s-1) With Immediate Effect
2023-06-28SenatePassed Roll Call # 427 Yeas 31 Nays 6 Excused 1 Not Voting 0
2023-06-28SenateAmendment(s) Adopted
2023-06-28SenateVote Reconsidered
2023-06-28SenatePlaced On Order Of Third Reading
2023-06-28HouseRetransmitted
2023-06-28HouseRequest Granted
2023-06-28HouseSenate Requests Return
2023-06-27SenateSenate Requests Return
2023-06-27HouseLaid Over One Day Under The Rules
2023-06-27HouseReturned From Senate With Substitute (s-1) With Immediate Effect
2023-06-27SenatePassed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 392 Yeas 31 Nays 6 Excused 1 Not Voting 0
2023-06-27SenatePlaced On Immediate Passage
2023-06-27SenateRules Suspended
2023-06-27SenatePlaced On Order Of Third Reading With Substitute (s-1)
2023-06-27SenateSubstitute (s-1) Concurred In
2023-06-27SenateReported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably With Substitute (s-1)
2023-06-27SenateReferred To Committee Of The Whole
2023-06-27SenateRules Suspended
2023-06-21HouseTransmitted
2023-06-21HousePassed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 184 Yeas 98 Nays 11 Excused 0 Not Voting 1
2023-06-21HouseRead A Third Time
2023-06-20HousePlaced On Third Reading
2023-06-20HouseSubstitute (h-1) Adopted
2023-06-20HouseRead A Second Time
2023-05-17HouseReferred To Second Reading
2023-05-17HouseReported With Recommendation With Substitute (h-1)
2023-03-21HouseBill Electronically Reproduced 03/16/2023
2023-03-16HouseReferred To Committee On Judiciary
2023-03-16HouseRead A First Time
2023-03-16HouseIntroduced By Representative Kara Hope

Same As/Similar To

SB0209 (Same As) 2023-07-18 - Assigned Pa 0071'23 With Immediate Effect
SB0212 (Same As) 2023-07-18 - Assigned Pa 0072'23 With Immediate Effect
HB4295 (Same As) 2023-09-19 - Assigned Pa 122'23 With Immediate Effect
HB4296 (Same As) 2023-09-19 - Assigned Pa 123'23 With Immediate Effect

Subjects


Michigan State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://legislature.mi.gov/Bills/Bill?ObjectName=2023-HB-4294
Texthttps://legislature.mi.gov/documents/2023-2024/billintroduced/House/htm/2023-HIB-4294.htm
Texthttps://legislature.mi.gov/documents/2023-2024/billengrossed/House/htm/2023-HEBH-4294.htm
Texthttps://legislature.mi.gov/documents/2023-2024/billengrossed/House/htm/2023-HEBS-4294.htm
Texthttps://legislature.mi.gov/documents/2023-2024/billenrolled/House/htm/2023-HNB-4294.htm
Texthttps://legislature.mi.gov/documents/2023-2024/publicact/htm/2023-PA-0121.htm
Amendmenthttps://legislature.mi.gov/mileg.aspx?page=CurrentVersionAmendment&cvFileName=2023-HCVBS-4294-0N295.pdf
Amendmenthttps://legislature.mi.gov/mileg.aspx?page=CurrentVersionAmendment&cvFileName=2023-HCVBS-4294-0O338.pdf
Amendmenthttps://legislature.mi.gov/mileg.aspx?page=CurrentVersionAmendment&cvFileName=2023-HCVBS-4294-00D418.pdf
Amendmenthttps://legislature.mi.gov/mileg.aspx?page=CurrentVersionAmendment&cvFileName=2023-HCVBS-4294-00C718.pdf
Amendmenthttps://legislature.mi.gov/mileg.aspx?page=CurrentVersionAmendment&cvFileName=2023-HCVBS-4294-00C717.pdf
Supplementhttps://legislature.mi.gov/documents/2023-2024/billanalysis/House/pdf/2023-HLA-4293-A2297E85.pdf
Supplementhttps://legislature.mi.gov/documents/2023-2024/billanalysis/House/pdf/2023-HLA-4293-DB515F9C.pdf
Supplementhttps://legislature.mi.gov/documents/2023-2024/billanalysis/Senate/pdf/2023-SFA-4294-L.pdf
Supplementhttps://legislature.mi.gov/documents/2023-2024/billanalysis/House/pdf/2023-HLA-0209-4F125C0D.pdf
Supplementhttps://legislature.mi.gov/documents/2023-2024/billanalysis/LSB/pdf/2023-LSB-4294-A.pdf
Roll Callhttps://legislature.mi.gov/documents/2023-2024/Journal/House/htm/2023-HJ-05-17-045.htm
Roll Callhttps://legislature.mi.gov/documents/2023-2024/Journal/House/htm/2023-HJ-06-21-058.htm
Roll Callhttps://legislature.mi.gov/documents/2023-2024/Journal/Senate/htm/2023-SJ-06-27-062.htm
Roll Callhttps://legislature.mi.gov/documents/2023-2024/Journal/Senate/htm/2023-SJ-06-28-063.htm
Roll Callhttps://legislature.mi.gov/documents/2023-2024/Journal/House/htm/2023-HJ-09-06-069.htm

Bill Comments

feedback