MI HB4293 | 2021-2022 | 101st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 27 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-06-02 - Referred To Committee On Education And Career Readiness
Pending: Senate Education And Career Readiness Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 27 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-06-02 - Referred To Committee On Education And Career Readiness
Pending: Senate Education And Career Readiness Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Education: teachers; exceptions to requirement to bargain collectively by certain employers; modify. Amends sec. 15 of 1947 PA 336 (MCL 423.215). TIE BAR WITH: HB 4294'21
Title
Education: teachers; exceptions to requirement to bargain collectively by certain employers; modify. Amends sec. 15 of 1947 PA 336 (MCL 423.215). TIE BAR WITH: HB 4294'21
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-05-27 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 262 (Y: 56 N: 52 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-04 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-04 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-02 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Education And Career Readiness |
2021-05-27 | House | Transmitted |
2021-05-27 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 262 Yeas 56 Nays 52 Excused 0 Not Voting 2 |
2021-05-27 | House | Read A Third Time |
2021-05-26 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2021-05-26 | House | Read A Second Time |
2021-05-04 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2021-03-18 | House | Referred To Committee On Education |
2021-05-04 | House | Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment |
2021-02-24 | House | Bill Electronically Reproduced 02/23/2021 |
2021-02-23 | House | Referred To Committee On Workforce, Trades, And Talent |
2021-02-23 | House | Read A First Time |
2021-02-23 | House | Introduced By Representative John Damoose |