MI HB4285 | 2021-2022 | 101st Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-2)
Status: Passed on December 15 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-12-15 - Assigned Pa 147'21 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-2)
Status: Passed on December 15 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-12-15 - Assigned Pa 147'21 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Elections: filing fees; candidate filing fee in lieu of nominating petitions for township offices; make nonrefundable. Amends sec. 349 of 1954 PA 116 (MCL 168.349).
Title
Elections: filing fees; candidate filing fee in lieu of nominating petitions for township offices; make nonrefundable. Amends sec. 349 of 1954 PA 116 (MCL 168.349).
Sponsors
Rep. Ann Bollin [R] | Rep. Terry Sabo [D] | Rep. Matt Koleszar [D] | Rep. Amos O'Neal [D] |
Rep. Julie Calley [R] | Sen. Kevin Hertel [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-12-14 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 488 (Y: 35 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-10-14 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-14 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 108 (Y: 90 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-10 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-10-14 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-14 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 108 (Y: 90 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-10 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-12-15 | House | Assigned Pa 147'21 With Immediate Effect |
2021-12-15 | House | Filed With Secretary Of State 12/27/2021 12:28 Pm |
2021-12-15 | House | Approved By The Governor 12/23/2021 10:16 Am |
2021-12-15 | House | Presented To The Governor 12/17/2021 11:08 Am |
2021-12-14 | House | Bill Ordered Enrolled |
2021-12-14 | House | Full Title Agreed To |
2021-12-14 | House | Returned From Senate Without Amendment With Immediate Effect And Full Title |
2021-12-14 | Senate | Inserted Full Title |
2021-12-14 | Senate | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 488 Yeas 35 Nays 1 Excused 2 Not Voting 0 |
2021-12-09 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading |
2021-12-09 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably Without Amendment(s) |
2021-10-14 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole |
2021-10-14 | Senate | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect |
2021-10-14 | Senate | Reported Favorably Without Amendment |
2021-04-15 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Elections |
2021-04-14 | House | Transmitted |
2021-04-14 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 108 Yeas 90 Nays 20 Excused 0 Not Voting 0 |
2021-04-14 | House | Read A Third Time |
2021-04-13 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2021-04-13 | House | Read A Second Time |
2021-03-10 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2021-03-10 | House | Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment |
2021-02-24 | House | Bill Electronically Reproduced 02/23/2021 |
2021-02-23 | House | Referred To Committee On Elections And Ethics |
2021-02-23 | House | Read A First Time |
2021-02-23 | House | Introduced By Representative Ann Bollin |