MI HB4285 | 2017-2018 | 99th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on November 28 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-11-28 - Assigned Pa 189'17 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Property tax; payment and collection; personal liability for unpaid property taxes; clarify. Amends secs. 47 & 89a of 1893 PA 206 (MCL 211.47 & 211.89a).

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Property tax; payment and collection; personal liability for unpaid property taxes; clarify. Amends secs. 47 & 89a of 1893 PA 206 (MCL 211.47 & 211.89a).

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-11-07 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Roll Call # 443 (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-10-24 - House - House Third Reading: Roll Call # 322 (Y: 106 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-10-18 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 394 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-09-26 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-08 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 196 (Y: 106 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-17 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-11-28HouseAssigned Pa 189'17 With Immediate Effect
2017-11-28HouseFiled With Secretary Of State 11/21/2017 @ 4:12 Pm
2017-11-28HouseApproved By The Governor 11/20/2017 @ 10:30 Am
2017-11-09HousePresented To The Governor 11/9/2017 @ 11:57 Am
2017-11-07HouseBill Ordered Enrolled
2017-11-07HouseRe-returned From Senate With Concurrence To House Amendment(s) To Senate Substitute S-2
2017-11-07Senate Roll Call # 443 Yeas 35 Nays 0 Excused 3 Not Voting 0
2017-11-07SenateReturned From House With Amendment(s) To Senate Substitute S-2
2017-10-24HouseRetransmitted
2017-10-24HouseFull Title Agreed To
2017-10-24House Roll Call # 322 Yeas 106 Nays 1
2017-10-24HouseSenate Substitute S-2 Concurred In As Amended
2017-10-24HouseAmended
2017-10-18HouseLaid Over One Day Under The Rules
2017-10-18HouseReturned From Senate With Substitute S-2 With Immediate Effect And Full Title
2017-10-18SenateInserted Full Title
2017-10-18SenatePassed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 394 Yeas 37 Nays 0 Excused 1 Not Voting 0
2017-10-17SenatePlaced On Order Of Third Reading With Substitute S-2
2017-10-17SenateSubstitute S-2 Concurred In
2017-10-17SenateReported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably With Substitute S-2
2017-09-26SenateReferred To Committee Of The Whole With Substitute S-1
2017-09-26SenateCommittee Recommended Immediate Effect
2017-09-26SenateReported Favorably With Substitute S-1
2017-06-13SenateReferred To Committee On Finance
2017-06-08HouseTransmitted
2017-06-08HousePassed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 196 Yeas 106 Nays 1
2017-06-08HouseRead A Third Time
2017-06-07HousePlaced On Third Reading
2017-06-07HouseSubstitute H-2 Adopted
2017-06-07HouseSubstitute H-1 Not Adopted
2017-06-07HouseRead A Second Time
2017-05-17HouseReferred To Second Reading
2017-05-17HouseReported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1
2017-03-02HouseBill Electronically Reproduced 03/01/2017
2017-03-01HouseReferred To Committee On Tax Policy
2017-03-01HouseRead A First Time
2017-03-01HouseIntroduced By Representative Peter Lucido

Subjects


Michigan State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://legislature.mi.gov/doc.aspx?2017-HB-4285
Texthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2017-2018/billintroduced/House/htm/2017-HIB-4285.htm
Texthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2017-2018/billengrossed/House/htm/2017-HEBH-4285.htm
Texthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2017-2018/billengrossed/House/htm/2017-HEBS-4285.htm
Texthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2017-2018/billenrolled/House/htm/2017-HNB-4285.htm
Texthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2017-2018/publicact/htm/2017-PA-0189.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2017-2018/Journal/House/htm/2017-HJ-05-17-046.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2017-2018/Journal/House/htm/2017-HJ-06-08-055.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2017-2018/Journal/Senate/htm/2017-SJ-09-26-074.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2017-2018/Journal/Senate/htm/2017-SJ-10-18-084.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2017-2018/Journal/House/htm/2017-HJ-10-24-081.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2017-2018/Journal/Senate/htm/2017-SJ-11-07-092.htm

Bill Comments

feedback