MI HB4283 | 2021-2022 | 101st Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-2)
Status: Engrossed on April 14 2021 - 50% progression
Action: 2021-10-14 - Referred To Committee Of The Whole
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Elections: candidates; candidate filing fee in lieu of nominating petitions for the office of county commissioner; make nonrefundable. Amends secs. 11 & 11a of 1966 PA 261 (MCL 46.411 & 46.411a).

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Elections: candidates; candidate filing fee in lieu of nominating petitions for the office of county commissioner; make nonrefundable. Amends secs. 11 & 11a of 1966 PA 261 (MCL 46.411 & 46.411a).

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-10-14 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-14 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 106 (Y: 90 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-10 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-10-14SenateReferred To Committee Of The Whole
2021-10-14SenateCommittee Recommended Immediate Effect
2021-10-14SenateReported Favorably Without Amendment
2021-04-15SenateReferred To Committee On Elections
2021-04-14HouseTransmitted
2021-04-14HousePassed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 106 Yeas 90 Nays 20 Excused 0 Not Voting 0
2021-04-14HouseRead A Third Time
2021-04-13HousePlaced On Third Reading
2021-04-13HouseRead A Second Time
2021-03-10HouseReferred To Second Reading
2021-03-10HouseReported With Recommendation Without Amendment
2021-02-24HouseBill Electronically Reproduced 02/23/2021
2021-02-23HouseReferred To Committee On Elections And Ethics
2021-02-23HouseRead A First Time
2021-02-23HouseIntroduced By Representative Terry Sabo

Subjects


Michigan State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://legislature.mi.gov/doc.aspx?2021-HB-4283
Texthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2021-2022/billintroduced/House/htm/2021-HIB-4283.htm
Texthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2021-2022/billengrossed/House/htm/2021-HEBH-4283.htm
Supplementhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2021-2022/billanalysis/House/pdf/2021-HLA-4282-E6F7A454.pdf
Supplementhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2021-2022/billanalysis/House/pdf/2021-HLA-4282-F0CF675E.pdf
Supplementhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2021-2022/billanalysis/House/pdf/2021-HLA-4282-C4BC9D25.pdf
Supplementhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2021-2022/billanalysis/Senate/pdf/2021-SFA-4282-L.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2021-2022/Journal/House/htm/2021-HJ-03-10-021.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2021-2022/Journal/House/htm/2021-HJ-04-14-030.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2021-2022/Journal/Senate/htm/2021-SJ-10-14-081.htm

Bill Comments

feedback