MI HB4282 | 2009-2010 | 95th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-0)
Status: Introduced on February 17 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2009-06-16 - Referred To Committee On Commerce And Tourism
Pending: Senate Commerce & Tourism Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 17 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2009-06-16 - Referred To Committee On Commerce And Tourism
Pending: Senate Commerce & Tourism Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
State financing and management; purchasing; debarment process for vendors; modify. Amends sec. 264 of 1984 PA 431 (MCL 18.1264).
Title
State financing and management; purchasing; debarment process for vendors; modify. Amends sec. 264 of 1984 PA 431 (MCL 18.1264).
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-06-16 | Referred To Committee On Commerce And Tourism | |
2009-06-11 | Transmitted | |
2009-06-11 | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 289 Yeas 66 Nays 42 | |
2009-06-11 | Read A Third Time | |
2009-06-11 | Placed On Immediate Passage | |
2009-06-11 | Placed On Third Reading | |
2009-06-11 | Substitute H-3 Adopted | |
2009-06-11 | Substitute H-2 Not Adopted | |
2009-06-11 | Read A Second Time | |
2009-04-01 | Referred To Second Reading | |
2009-04-01 | Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-2 | |
2009-02-18 | Printed Bill Filed 02/18/2009 | |
2009-02-17 | Referred To Committee On Commerce | |
2009-02-17 | Read A First Time | |
2009-02-17 | Introduced By Representative Fred Miller |