MI HB4281 | 2021-2022 | 101st Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-0)
Status: Passed on November 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-11-30 - Assigned Pa 113'21 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-0)
Status: Passed on November 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-11-30 - Assigned Pa 113'21 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Cities: public services; qualified city in the police and fire protection act; modify population threshold, and expand definition of qualified city to include a city that contains a qualified airport. Amends sec. 10 of 1951 PA 33 (MCL 41.810).
Title
Cities: public services; qualified city in the police and fire protection act; modify population threshold, and expand definition of qualified city to include a city that contains a qualified airport. Amends sec. 10 of 1951 PA 33 (MCL 41.810).
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-11-02 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 426 (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-10-27 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 509 (Y: 95 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-10-06 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-2 (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-10-27 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 509 (Y: 95 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-10-06 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-2 (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-11-30 | House | Assigned Pa 113'21 With Immediate Effect |
2021-11-30 | House | Filed With Secretary Of State 11/10/2021 04:10 Pm |
2021-11-30 | House | Approved By The Governor 11/10/2021 03:48 Pm |
2021-11-09 | House | Presented To The Governor 11/05/2021 01:37 Pm |
2021-11-02 | House | Bill Ordered Enrolled |
2021-11-02 | House | Returned From Senate Without Amendment With Immediate Effect |
2021-11-02 | Senate | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 426 Yeas 35 Nays 0 Excused 1 Not Voting 0 |
2021-11-02 | Senate | Placed On Immediate Passage |
2021-11-02 | Senate | Rules Suspended |
2021-11-02 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading |
2021-11-02 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably Without Amendment(s) |
2021-11-02 | Senate | Placed On Order Of General Orders |
2021-11-02 | Senate | Discharge Committee Approved |
2021-10-28 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Local Government |
2021-10-27 | House | Transmitted |
2021-10-27 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 509 Yeas 95 Nays 11 Excused 0 Not Voting 3 |
2021-10-27 | House | Read A Third Time |
2021-10-26 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2021-10-26 | House | Substitute (h-2) Adopted |
2021-10-26 | House | Read A Second Time |
2021-10-06 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2021-10-06 | House | Reported With Recommendation With Substitute (h-2) |
2021-02-24 | House | Bill Electronically Reproduced 02/23/2021 |
2021-02-23 | House | Referred To Committee On Local Government And Municipal Finance |
2021-02-23 | House | Read A First Time |
2021-02-23 | House | Introduced By Representative Alex Garza |
Subjects
Aeronautics: other
Cities: public services
Law enforcement: fire personnel
Law enforcement: local police
Cities: public services
Law enforcement: fire personnel
Law enforcement: local police