MI HB4264 | 2023-2024 | 102nd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 15-0)
Status: Introduced on March 14 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-09-20 - Motion To Discharge Committee Rejected
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 14 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-09-20 - Motion To Discharge Committee Rejected
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Legislature: legislators; voting on bills when a conflict of interest exists; prohibit. Amends 1968 PA 318 (MCL 15.301 - 15.310) by adding sec. 8a. TIE BAR WITH: HB 4265'23, HB 4267'23, HB 4268'23, HB 4269'23
Title
Legislature: legislators; voting on bills when a conflict of interest exists; prohibit. Amends 1968 PA 318 (MCL 15.301 - 15.310) by adding sec. 8a. TIE BAR WITH: HB 4265'23, HB 4267'23, HB 4268'23, HB 4269'23
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-09-20 | House | Motion To Discharge Committee Rejected |
2023-09-19 | House | Notice Given To Discharge Committee |
2023-03-15 | House | Bill Electronically Reproduced 03/14/2023 |
2023-03-14 | House | Referred To Committee On Ethics And Oversight |
2023-03-14 | House | Read A First Time |
2023-03-14 | House | Introduced By Representative Alicia St. Germaine |
Same As/Similar To
HB4265 (Same As) 2023-09-20 - Motion To Discharge Committee Rejected
HB4267 (Same As) 2023-09-20 - Motion To Discharge Committee Rejected
HB4268 (Same As) 2023-09-20 - Motion To Discharge Committee Rejected
HB4269 (Same As) 2023-09-20 - Motion To Discharge Committee Rejected
HB4267 (Same As) 2023-09-20 - Motion To Discharge Committee Rejected
HB4268 (Same As) 2023-09-20 - Motion To Discharge Committee Rejected
HB4269 (Same As) 2023-09-20 - Motion To Discharge Committee Rejected
Subjects
Michigan State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://legislature.mi.gov/Bills/Bill?ObjectName=2023-HB-4264 |
Text | https://legislature.mi.gov/documents/2023-2024/billintroduced/House/htm/2023-HIB-4264.htm |