MI HB4264 | 2015-2016 | 98th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 26 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-12-13 - Referred To Committee On Local Government
Pending: Senate Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 26 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-12-13 - Referred To Committee On Local Government
Pending: Senate Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
State; other; accurate boundaries of the state; establish in statute. Amends title & secs. 1 & 2 of 1945 PA 78 (MCL 2.1 & 2.2).
Title
State; other; accurate boundaries of the state; establish in statute. Amends title & secs. 1 & 2 of 1945 PA 78 (MCL 2.1 & 2.2).
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-12-08 - House - House Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 602 (Y: 106 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-11-30 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-11-30 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-12-13 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Local Government |
2016-12-08 | House | Transmitted |
2016-12-08 | House | Passed Roll Call # 602 Yeas 106 Nays 1 |
2016-12-08 | House | Read A Third Time |
2016-12-07 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2016-12-07 | House | Substitute H-1 Adopted |
2016-12-07 | House | Read A Second Time |
2016-11-30 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2016-11-30 | House | Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment |
2015-03-03 | House | Printed Bill Filed 02/27/2015 |
2015-02-26 | House | Referred To Committee On Local Government |
2015-02-26 | House | Read A First Time |
2015-02-26 | House | Introduced By Representative Phil Potvin |