MI HB4259 | 2019-2020 | 100th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 25-7)
Status: Engrossed on February 25 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-26 - Referred To Committee On Judiciary And Public Safety
Pending: Senate Judiciary And Public Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 25 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-26 - Referred To Committee On Judiciary And Public Safety
Pending: Senate Judiciary And Public Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Criminal procedure: sentencing guidelines; sentencing guidelines for embezzlement from vulnerable adult; modify to include elder adults. Amends sec. 16i, ch. XVII of 1927 PA 175 (MCL 777.16i).
Title
Criminal procedure: sentencing guidelines; sentencing guidelines for embezzlement from vulnerable adult; modify to include elder adults. Amends sec. 16i, ch. XVII of 1927 PA 175 (MCL 777.16i).
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-02-25 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 114 (Y: 102 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-11 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-11 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-26 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Judiciary And Public Safety |
2020-02-25 | House | Transmitted |
2020-02-25 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 114 Yeas 102 Nays 5 Excused 0 Not Voting 2 |
2020-02-25 | House | Read A Third Time |
2020-02-25 | House | Placed On Immediate Passage |
2020-02-25 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2020-02-25 | House | Read A Second Time |
2020-02-11 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2020-02-11 | House | Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment |
2019-09-18 | House | Referred To Committee On Judiciary |
2019-02-26 | House | Bill Electronically Reproduced 02/26/2019 |
2019-02-26 | House | Referred To Committee On Families, Children, And Seniors |
2019-02-26 | House | Read A First Time |
2019-02-26 | House | Introduced By Representative Vanessa Guerra |