MI HB4249 | 2019-2020 | 100th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 26 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-26 - Assigned Pa 30'19 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Communications; emergency 9-1-1; requirement that 9-1-1 service users with a multiline telephone system install additional equipment; eliminate, and rescind administrative rules. Amends sec. 413 of 1986 PA 32 (MCL 484.1413); repeals sec. 405 of 1986 PA 32 (MCL 484.1405) & rescinds R 484.901 - R 484.906 of the Michigan Administrative Code.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Communications; emergency 9-1-1; requirement that 9-1-1 service users with a multiline telephone system install additional equipment; eliminate, and rescind administrative rules. Amends sec. 413 of 1986 PA 32 (MCL 484.1413); repeals sec. 405 of 1986 PA 32 (MCL 484.1405) & rescinds R 484.901 - R 484.906 of the Michigan Administrative Code.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-06-12 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 135 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-06-05 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-24 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 103 (Y: 106 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-21 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-4 (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-26HouseAssigned Pa 30'19 With Immediate Effect
2019-06-26HouseFiled With Secretary Of State 6/25/2019 @ 10:28 Am
2019-06-26HouseApproved By The Governor 6/25/2019 @ 9:02 Am
2019-06-19HousePresented To The Governor 6/19/2019 @ 2:24 Pm
2019-06-12HouseBill Ordered Enrolled
2019-06-12HouseFull Title Agreed To
2019-06-12HouseReturned From Senate Without Amendment With Immediate Effect And Full Title
2019-06-12SenateInserted Full Title
2019-06-12SenatePassed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 135 Yeas 36 Nays 0 Excused 2 Not Voting 0
2019-06-11SenatePlaced On Order Of Third Reading
2019-06-11SenateReported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably Without Amendment(s)
2019-06-05SenateReferred To Committee Of The Whole
2019-06-05SenateCommittee Recommended Immediate Effect
2019-06-05SenateReported Favorably Without Amendment
2019-06-04SenateReferred To Committee On Energy And Technology
2019-05-24HouseTransmitted
2019-05-24HousePassed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 103 Yeas 106 Nays 3
2019-05-24HouseRead A Third Time
2019-05-23HousePlaced On Third Reading
2019-05-23HouseSubstitute H-4 Adopted
2019-05-23HouseRead A Second Time
2019-05-21HouseReferred To Second Reading
2019-05-21HouseReported With Recommendation With Substitute H-4
2019-05-01HouseReferred To Committee On Ways And Means, With H-2
2019-02-27HouseBill Electronically Reproduced 02/26/2019
2019-02-26HouseReferred To Committee On Communications And Technology
2019-02-26HouseRead A First Time
2019-02-26HouseIntroduced By Representative Michele Hoitenga

Subjects


Michigan State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://legislature.mi.gov/doc.aspx?2019-HB-4249
Texthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2019-2020/billintroduced/House/htm/2019-HIB-4249.htm
Texthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2019-2020/billengrossed/House/htm/2019-HEBH-4249.htm
Texthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2019-2020/billengrossed/House/htm/2019-HEBS-4249.htm
Texthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2019-2020/billenrolled/House/htm/2019-HNB-4249.htm
Texthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2019-2020/publicact/htm/2019-PA-0030.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2019-2020/Journal/House/htm/2019-HJ-05-21-049.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2019-2020/Journal/House/htm/2019-HJ-05-24-052.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2019-2020/Journal/Senate/htm/2019-SJ-06-05-057.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2019-2020/Journal/Senate/htm/2019-SJ-06-12-060.htm

Bill Comments

feedback