MI HB4247 | 2021-2022 | 101st Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 17-10)
Status: Passed on December 15 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-12-15 - Assigned Pa 127'21 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 17-10)
Status: Passed on December 15 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-12-15 - Assigned Pa 127'21 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Higher education: financial aid; tuition assistance benefits for certain survivors of Michigan police officers and Michigan fire fighters killed in the line of duty; modify. Amends secs. 2 & 3 of 1996 PA 195 (MCL 390.1242 & 390.1243).
Title
Higher education: financial aid; tuition assistance benefits for certain survivors of Michigan police officers and Michigan fire fighters killed in the line of duty; modify. Amends secs. 2 & 3 of 1996 PA 195 (MCL 390.1242 & 390.1243).
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-12-01 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 455 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-09-30 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-25 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 15 (Y: 109 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-17 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-09-30 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-25 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 15 (Y: 109 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-17 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-12-15 | House | Assigned Pa 127'21 With Immediate Effect |
2021-12-15 | House | Filed With Secretary Of State 12/17/2021 04:22 Pm |
2021-12-15 | House | Approved By The Governor 12/16/2021 05:31 Pm |
2021-12-02 | House | Presented To The Governor 12/06/2021 09:37 Am |
2021-12-01 | House | Bill Ordered Enrolled |
2021-12-01 | House | Full Title Agreed To |
2021-12-01 | House | Returned From Senate Without Amendment With Immediate Effect And Full Title |
2021-12-01 | Senate | Inserted Full Title |
2021-12-01 | Senate | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 455 Yeas 36 Nays 0 Excused 2 Not Voting 0 |
2021-11-30 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading |
2021-11-30 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably Without Amendment(s) |
2021-09-30 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole |
2021-09-30 | Senate | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect |
2021-09-30 | Senate | Reported Favorably Without Amendment |
2021-03-02 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Appropriations |
2021-02-25 | House | Transmitted |
2021-02-25 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 15 Yeas 109 Nays 0 Excused 0 Not Voting 1 |
2021-02-25 | House | Read A Third Time |
2021-02-24 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2021-02-24 | House | Read A Second Time |
2021-02-17 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2021-02-17 | House | Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment |
2021-02-17 | House | Bill Electronically Reproduced 02/16/2021 |
2021-02-16 | House | Referred To Committee On Appropriations |
2021-02-16 | House | Read A First Time |
2021-02-16 | House | Introduced By Representative Matt Koleszar |