MI HB4245 | 2019-2020 | 100th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on January 28 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-01-28 - Assigned Pa 21'20 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on January 28 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-01-28 - Assigned Pa 21'20 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Appropriations: zero budget; supplemental appropriations; provide for fiscal year 2018-2019. Creates appropriation act.
Title
Appropriations: zero budget; supplemental appropriations; provide for fiscal year 2018-2019. Creates appropriation act.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-01-21 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 19 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-16 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 23 (Y: 106 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-12-11 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-16 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 23 (Y: 106 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-12-11 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-28 | House | Assigned Pa 21'20 With Immediate Effect |
2020-01-28 | House | Filed With Secretary Of State 01/27/2020 03:34 Pm |
2020-01-28 | House | Approved By The Governor 01/27/2020 02:03 Pm |
2020-01-22 | House | Presented To The Governor 01/22/2020 01:50 Pm |
2020-01-21 | House | Bill Ordered Enrolled |
2020-01-21 | House | Returned From Senate Without Amendment With Immediate Effect |
2020-01-21 | Senate | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 19 Yeas 38 Nays 0 Excused 0 Not Voting 0 |
2020-01-21 | Senate | Placed On Immediate Passage |
2020-01-21 | Senate | Rules Suspended |
2020-01-21 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading |
2020-01-21 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably Without Amendment(s) |
2020-01-21 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole |
2020-01-21 | Senate | Rules Suspended |
2020-01-16 | House | Transmitted |
2020-01-16 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 23 Yeas 106 Nays 0 Excused 0 Not Voting 3 |
2020-01-16 | House | Read A Third Time |
2020-01-16 | House | Placed On Immediate Passage |
2020-01-16 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2020-01-16 | House | Substitute (h-2) Adopted |
2020-01-16 | House | Read A Second Time |
2019-12-11 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2019-12-11 | House | Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment |
2019-02-26 | House | Bill Electronically Reproduced 02/26/2019 |
2019-02-26 | House | Referred To Committee On Appropriations |
2019-02-26 | House | Read A First Time |
2019-02-26 | House | Introduced By Representative Shane Hernandez |