MI HB4244 | 2019-2020 | 100th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 5 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-05 - Assigned Pa 12'19 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 5 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-05 - Assigned Pa 12'19 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Appropriations: supplemental; Michigan natural resources trust fund; provide appropriations for fiscal year 2018-2019. Creates appropriation act.
Title
Appropriations: supplemental; Michigan natural resources trust fund; provide appropriations for fiscal year 2018-2019. Creates appropriation act.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-25 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 45 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-11 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-07 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 10 (Y: 105 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-27 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-11 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-07 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 10 (Y: 105 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-27 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-05 | House | Assigned Pa 12'19 With Immediate Effect |
2019-05-14 | House | Filed With Secretary Of State 05/14/2019 03:28 Pm |
2019-05-14 | House | Approved By The Governor 05/14/2019 02:31 Pm |
2019-05-14 | House | Presented To The Governor 05/07/2019 10:45 Am |
2019-04-25 | House | Bill Ordered Enrolled |
2019-04-25 | House | Returned From Senate Without Amendment With Immediate Effect |
2019-04-25 | Senate | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 45 Yeas 38 Nays 0 Excused 0 Not Voting 0 |
2019-04-25 | Senate | Placed On Immediate Passage |
2019-04-25 | Senate | Rules Suspended |
2019-04-25 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading |
2019-04-25 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably Without Amendment(s) |
2019-04-11 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole |
2019-04-11 | Senate | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect |
2019-04-11 | Senate | Reported Favorably Without Amendment |
2019-03-12 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Appropriations |
2019-03-07 | House | Transmitted |
2019-03-07 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 10 Yeas 105 Nays 0 Excused 0 Not Voting 5 |
2019-03-07 | House | Read A Third Time |
2019-03-05 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2019-03-05 | House | Substitute (h-1) Adopted |
2019-03-05 | House | Read A Second Time |
2019-02-27 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2019-02-27 | House | Reported With Recommendation With Substitute (h-1) |
2019-02-26 | House | Bill Electronically Reproduced 02/26/2019 |
2019-02-26 | House | Referred To Committee On Appropriations |
2019-02-26 | House | Read A First Time |
2019-02-26 | House | Introduced By Representative Phil Green |