MI HB4239 | 2021-2022 | 101st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 25 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-05-26 - Referred To Committee On Judiciary And Public Safety
Pending: Senate Judiciary And Public Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 25 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-05-26 - Referred To Committee On Judiciary And Public Safety
Pending: Senate Judiciary And Public Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Crimes: vehicle offenses; vehicle immobilization requirements; modify. Amends secs. 219, 904c & 904f of 1949 PA 300 (MCL 257.219 et seq.).
Title
Crimes: vehicle offenses; vehicle immobilization requirements; modify. Amends secs. 219, 904c & 904f of 1949 PA 300 (MCL 257.219 et seq.).
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-05-25 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 273 (Y: 106 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-10 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-10 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-26 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Judiciary And Public Safety |
2022-05-25 | House | Transmitted |
2022-05-25 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 273 Yeas 106 Nays 1 Excused 0 Not Voting 3 |
2022-05-25 | House | Read A Third Time |
2022-05-19 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2022-05-19 | House | Read A Second Time |
2022-05-10 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2022-05-10 | House | Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment |
2021-02-16 | House | Bill Electronically Reproduced 02/11/2021 |
2021-02-11 | House | Referred To Committee On Judiciary |
2021-02-11 | House | Read A First Time |
2021-02-11 | House | Introduced By Representative Mike Mueller |