MI HB4224 | 2019-2020 | 100th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-2)
Status: Engrossed on April 11 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-16 - Referred To Committee On Health Policy And Human Services
Pending: Senate Health Policy And Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 11 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-16 - Referred To Committee On Health Policy And Human Services
Pending: Senate Health Policy And Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Health occupations: health professionals; definition of bona fide prescriber-patient relationship; revise. Amends sec. 7104 of 1978 PA 368 (MCL 333.7104). TIE BAR WITH: HB 4225'19
Title
Health occupations: health professionals; definition of bona fide prescriber-patient relationship; revise. Amends sec. 7104 of 1978 PA 368 (MCL 333.7104). TIE BAR WITH: HB 4225'19
Sponsors
Sen. Michele Hoitenga [R] | Rep. Bronna Kahle [R] | Rep. Elizabeth Griffin [R] | Rep. Ben Frederick [R] |
Rep. Terry Sabo [D] | Rep. Luke Meerman [R] | Rep. Frank Liberati [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-04-11 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 46 (Y: 110 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-09 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-09 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-16 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Health Policy And Human Services |
2019-04-11 | House | Transmitted |
2019-04-11 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 46 Yeas 110 Nays 0 Excused 0 Not Voting 0 |
2019-04-11 | House | Read A Third Time |
2019-04-10 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2019-04-10 | House | Substitute (h-1) Adopted |
2019-04-10 | House | Read A Second Time |
2019-04-09 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2019-04-09 | House | Reported With Recommendation With Substitute (h-1) |
2019-03-14 | House | Referred To Committee On Ways And Means, With Substitute (h-1) |
2019-02-21 | House | Bill Electronically Reproduced 02/21/2019 |
2019-02-21 | House | Referred To Committee On Health Policy |
2019-02-21 | House | Read A First Time |
2019-02-21 | House | Introduced By Representative Michele Hoitenga |
Subjects
Controlled substances: narcotic drugs
Health occupations: health professionals
Health: pharmaceuticals
Health occupations: health professionals
Health: pharmaceuticals