MI HB4219 | 2021-2022 | 101st Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-2)
Status: Passed on August 19 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-08-19 - Assigned Pa 78 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Criminal procedure: expunction; definition of first violation operating while intoxicated offense for purposes of expungement; provide for. Amends sec. 1 of 1965 PA 213 (MCL 780.621). TIE BAR WITH: HB 4220'21

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Criminal procedure: expunction; definition of first violation operating while intoxicated offense for purposes of expungement; provide for. Amends sec. 1 of 1965 PA 213 (MCL 780.621). TIE BAR WITH: HB 4220'21

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-08-17 - House - House Third Reading: Roll Call # 426 (Y: 92 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-10 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 267 (Y: 29 N: 5 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-06-10 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 265 (Y: 30 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-05-04 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-10 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 38 (Y: 93 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-23 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 (Y: 11 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-08-19HouseAssigned Pa 78 With Immediate Effect
2021-08-19HouseFiled With Secretary Of State 08/23/2021 04:12 Pm
2021-08-19HouseApproved By The Governor 08/23/2021 08:13 Am
2021-08-18HousePresented To The Governor 08/19/2021 09:32 Am
2021-08-17HouseBill Ordered Enrolled
2021-08-17HouseRoll Call Roll Call # 426 Yeas 92 Nays 16 Excused 0 Not Voting 2
2021-08-17HouseSenate Substitute (s-1) Concurred In
2021-06-10HouseLaid Over One Day Under The Rules
2021-06-10HouseReturned From Senate With Substitute (s-1) With Immediate Effect
2021-06-10SenateGiven Immediate Effect
2021-06-10SenatePassed Roll Call # 267 Yeas 25 Nays 5 Excused 2 Not Voting 1
2021-06-10SenateVote Reconsidered
2021-06-10SenatePassed Roll Call # 265 Yeas 30 Nays 4 Excused 1 Not Voting 1
2021-06-10SenatePlaced On Immediate Passage
2021-06-10SenateRules Suspended
2021-06-10SenatePlaced On Order Of Third Reading With Substitute (s-1)
2021-06-10SenateSubstitute (s-1) Concurred In
2021-06-10SenateReported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably With Substitute (s-1)
2021-05-04SenateReferred To Committee Of The Whole With Substitute (s-1)
2021-05-04SenateReported Favorably With Substitute (s-1)
2021-03-11SenateReferred To Committee On Judiciary And Public Safety
2021-03-10HouseTransmitted
2021-03-10HousePassed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 38 Yeas 93 Nays 17 Excused 0 Not Voting 0
2021-03-10HouseRead A Third Time
2021-03-03HousePlaced On Third Reading
2021-03-03HouseSubstitute (h-1) Adopted
2021-03-03HouseRead A Second Time
2021-02-23HouseReferred To Second Reading
2021-02-23HouseReported With Recommendation With Substitute (h-1)
2021-02-16HouseBill Electronically Reproduced 02/11/2021
2021-02-11HouseReferred To Committee On Judiciary
2021-02-11HouseRead A First Time
2021-02-11HouseIntroduced By Representative Tenisha Yancey

Subjects


Michigan State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://legislature.mi.gov/doc.aspx?2021-HB-4219
Texthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2021-2022/billintroduced/House/htm/2021-HIB-4219.htm
Texthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2021-2022/billengrossed/House/htm/2021-HEBH-4219.htm
Texthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2021-2022/billengrossed/House/htm/2021-HEBS-4219.htm
Texthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2021-2022/billenrolled/House/htm/2021-HNB-4219.htm
Texthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2021-2022/publicact/htm/2021-PA-0078.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/mileg.aspx?page=CurrentVersionAmendment&cvFileName=2021-HCVBS-4219-0N295.pdf
Amendmenthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/mileg.aspx?page=CurrentVersionAmendment&cvFileName=2021-HCVBS-4219-00B716.pdf
Supplementhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2021-2022/billanalysis/House/pdf/2021-HLA-4219-7131BF53.pdf
Supplementhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2021-2022/billanalysis/House/pdf/2021-HLA-4219-8296195E.pdf
Supplementhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2021-2022/billanalysis/House/pdf/2021-HLA-4219-4CD1E992.pdf
Supplementhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2021-2022/billanalysis/House/pdf/2021-HLA-4219-3BCF1D64.pdf
Supplementhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2021-2022/billanalysis/House/pdf/2021-HLA-4219-2D29AD49.pdf
Supplementhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2021-2022/billanalysis/House/pdf/2021-HLA-4219-D2189E8C.pdf
Supplementhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2021-2022/billanalysis/Senate/pdf/2021-SFA-4219-L.pdf
Supplementhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2021-2022/billanalysis/House/pdf/2021-HLA-4219-7279D8F6.pdf
Supplementhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2021-2022/billanalysis/House/pdf/2021-HLA-4219-33904537.pdf
Supplementhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2021-2022/billanalysis/House/pdf/2021-HLA-4219-341FCCDD.pdf
Supplementhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2021-2022/billanalysis/Senate/pdf/2021-SFA-4219-F.pdf
Supplementhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2021-2022/billanalysis/House/pdf/2021-HLA-4219-813A3759.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2021-2022/Journal/House/htm/2021-HJ-02-23-014.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2021-2022/Journal/House/htm/2021-HJ-03-10-021.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2021-2022/Journal/Senate/htm/2021-SJ-05-04-038.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2021-2022/Journal/Senate/htm/2021-SJ-06-10-054.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2021-2022/Journal/House/htm/2021-HJ-08-17-068.htm

Bill Comments

feedback