MI HB4219 | 2017-2018 | 99th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 23 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-23 - Assigned Pa 34'17 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 23 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-23 - Assigned Pa 34'17 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Criminal procedure; sentencing; deferral and dismissal eligibility for victims of human trafficking; expand. Amends sec. 451c of 1931 PA 328 (MCL 750.451c).
Title
Criminal procedure; sentencing; deferral and dismissal eligibility for victims of human trafficking; expand. Amends sec. 451c of 1931 PA 328 (MCL 750.451c).
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-05-16 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 186 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-05-04 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-22 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 53 (Y: 108 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-07 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-04 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-22 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 53 (Y: 108 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-07 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-23 | House | Assigned Pa 34'17 With Immediate Effect |
2017-05-23 | House | Filed With Secretary Of State 5/23/2017 @ 10:42 Am |
2017-05-23 | House | Approved By The Governor 5/23/2017 @ 8:26 Am |
2017-05-18 | House | Presented To The Governor 5/18/2017 @ 12:42 Pm |
2017-05-16 | House | Bill Ordered Enrolled |
2017-05-16 | House | Full Title Agreed To |
2017-05-16 | House | Returned From Senate Without Amendment With Immediate Effect And Full Title |
2017-05-16 | Senate | Inserted Full Title |
2017-05-16 | Senate | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 186 Yeas 37 Nays 0 Excused 1 Not Voting 0 |
2017-05-10 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading |
2017-05-10 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably Without Amendment(s) |
2017-05-04 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole |
2017-05-04 | Senate | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect |
2017-05-04 | Senate | Reported Favorably Without Amendment |
2017-03-23 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Families, Seniors And Human Services |
2017-03-22 | House | Transmitted |
2017-03-22 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 53 Yeas 108 Nays 0 |
2017-03-22 | House | Read A Third Time |
2017-03-21 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2017-03-21 | House | Amended |
2017-03-21 | House | Read A Second Time |
2017-03-07 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2017-03-07 | House | Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment |
2017-02-16 | House | Bill Electronically Reproduced 02/15/2017 |
2017-02-15 | House | Referred To Committee On Law And Justice |
2017-02-15 | House | Read A First Time |
2017-02-15 | House | Introduced By Representative Bronna Kahle |