MI HB4218 | 2021-2022 | 101st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 10-2)
Status: Engrossed on May 19 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-05-20 - Referred To Committee On Regulatory Reform
Pending: Senate Regulatory Reform Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 19 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-05-20 - Referred To Committee On Regulatory Reform
Pending: Senate Regulatory Reform Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Gaming: lottery; multistate lottery games; allow winner to remain anonymous. Amends sec. 25 of 1972 PA 239 (MCL 432.25).
Title
Gaming: lottery; multistate lottery games; allow winner to remain anonymous. Amends sec. 25 of 1972 PA 239 (MCL 432.25).
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-05-19 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 213 (Y: 107 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-04 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-04 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-20 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Regulatory Reform |
2021-05-19 | House | Transmitted |
2021-05-19 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 213 Yeas 107 Nays 1 Excused 0 Not Voting 2 |
2021-05-19 | House | Read A Third Time |
2021-05-18 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2021-05-18 | House | Read A Second Time |
2021-05-04 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2021-05-04 | House | Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment |
2021-02-16 | House | Bill Electronically Reproduced 02/11/2021 |
2021-02-11 | House | Referred To Committee On Regulatory Reform |
2021-02-11 | House | Read A First Time |
2021-02-11 | House | Introduced By Representative Pat Outman |