MI HB4214 | 2011-2012 | 96th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 17 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-03-17 - Assigned Pa 4'11 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 17 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-03-17 - Assigned Pa 4'11 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Local government; other; local government and school district fiscal accountability act; create. Creates new act & repeals 1990 PA 72 (MCL 141.1201 - 141.1291). TIE BAR WITH: SB 0158'11
Title
Local government; other; local government and school district fiscal accountability act; create. Creates new act & repeals 1990 PA 72 (MCL 141.1201 - 141.1291). TIE BAR WITH: SB 0158'11
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-03-15 - House - House Third Reading: Roll Call # 34 (Y: 62 N: 48 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-09 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 52 (Y: 26 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-03 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-2 (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-23 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 16 (Y: 62 N: 47 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-17 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-2 (Y: 9 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-09 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 52 (Y: 26 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-03 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-2 (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-23 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 16 (Y: 62 N: 47 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-17 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-2 (Y: 9 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-03-17 | House | Assigned Pa 4'11 With Immediate Effect |
2011-03-17 | House | Filed With Secretary Of State 3/16/2011 @ 6:05 Pm |
2011-03-17 | House | Approved By The Governor 3/16/2011 @ 5:45 Pm |
2011-03-17 | House | Presented To The Governor 3/16/2011 @ 3:40 Pm |
2011-03-15 | House | Bill Ordered Enrolled |
2011-03-15 | House | Title Amendment Agreed To |
2011-03-15 | House | Roll Call # 34 Yeas 62 Nays 48 |
2011-03-15 | House | Senate Substitute S-4 Concurred In |
2011-03-09 | House | Laid Over One Day Under The Rules |
2011-03-09 | House | Returned From Senate With Substitute S-4 With Immediate Effect And Title Amendment |
2011-03-09 | Senate | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 52 Yeas 26 Nays 12 Excused 0 Not Voting 0 |
2011-03-09 | Senate | Amendment(s) Adopted |
2011-03-09 | Senate | Substitute S-5 Defeated |
2011-03-09 | Senate | Amendment(s) Defeated |
2011-03-08 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading With Substitute S-4 |
2011-03-08 | Senate | Substitute S-4 Concurred In |
2011-03-08 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably With Substitute S-4 |
2011-03-03 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole With Substitute S-2 |
2011-03-03 | Senate | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect |
2011-03-03 | Senate | Reported Favorably With Substitute S-2 |
2011-02-24 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Education |
2011-02-23 | House | Transmitted |
2011-02-23 | House | Title Amended |
2011-02-23 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 16 Yeas 62 Nays 47 |
2011-02-23 | House | Read A Third Time |
2011-02-22 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2011-02-22 | House | Substitute H-2 Adopted And Amended |
2011-02-22 | House | Read A Second Time |
2011-02-17 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2011-02-17 | House | Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-2 |
2011-02-10 | House | Printed Bill Filed 02/10/2011 |
2011-02-09 | House | Referred To Committee On Local, Intergovernmental, And Regional Affairs |
2011-02-09 | House | Read A First Time |
2011-02-09 | House | Introduced By Representative Al Pscholka |
Same As/Similar To
SB0153 (Same As) 2011-05-05 - Referred To Committee On Education
Subjects
Cities, other
Civil procedure, bankruptcy
Counties, other
Local government, other
Townships, other
Villages, other
Civil procedure, bankruptcy
Counties, other
Local government, other
Townships, other
Villages, other