MI HB4211 | 2017-2018 | 99th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 20 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-20 - Assigned Pa 53'2017 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 20 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-20 - Assigned Pa 53'2017 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Criminal procedure; evidence; testimony of expert witnesses regarding behavior pattern of human trafficking victims; allow under certain circumstances. Amends sec. 462g of 1931 PA 328 (MCL 750.462g).
Title
Criminal procedure; evidence; testimony of expert witnesses regarding behavior pattern of human trafficking victims; allow under certain circumstances. Amends sec. 462g of 1931 PA 328 (MCL 750.462g).
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-06-08 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 245 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-06-06 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-17 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 102 (Y: 106 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-07 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-06 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-17 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 102 (Y: 106 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-07 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-20 | House | Assigned Pa 53'2017 With Immediate Effect |
2017-06-20 | House | Filed With Secretary Of State 6/15/2017 @ 4:04 Pm |
2017-06-20 | House | Approved By The Governor 6/15/2017 @ 10:34 Am |
2017-06-14 | House | Presented To The Governor 6/13/2017 @ 12:04 Pm |
2017-06-08 | House | Bill Ordered Enrolled |
2017-06-08 | House | Full Title Agreed To |
2017-06-08 | House | Returned From Senate Without Amendment With Immediate Effect And Full Title |
2017-06-08 | Senate | Inserted Full Title |
2017-06-08 | Senate | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 245 Yeas 37 Nays 0 Excused 1 Not Voting 0 |
2017-06-07 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading |
2017-06-07 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably Without Amendment(s) |
2017-06-06 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole |
2017-06-06 | Senate | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect |
2017-06-06 | Senate | Reported Favorably Without Amendment |
2017-05-18 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Judiciary |
2017-05-17 | House | Transmitted |
2017-05-17 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 102 Yeas 106 Nays 1 |
2017-05-17 | House | Read A Third Time |
2017-05-17 | House | Placed On Immediate Passage |
2017-05-17 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2017-05-17 | House | Read A Second Time |
2017-03-07 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2017-03-07 | House | Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment |
2017-02-16 | House | Bill Electronically Reproduced 02/15/2017 |
2017-02-15 | House | Referred To Committee On Law And Justice |
2017-02-15 | House | Read A First Time |
2017-02-15 | House | Introduced By Representative Peter Lucido |
Subjects
Crime victims: other
Criminal procedure: evidence
Criminal procedure: trial
Criminal procedure: witnesses
Criminal procedure: evidence
Criminal procedure: trial
Criminal procedure: witnesses