MI HB4208 | 2017-2018 | 99th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 13 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-12-13 - Assigned Pa 192'17 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 13 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-12-13 - Assigned Pa 192'17 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Legislature; legislators; term of removal or resignation from the office of state senator or representative; provide for. Amends secs. 175 & 177 of 1954 PA 116 (MCL 168.175 & 168.177).
Title
Legislature; legislators; term of removal or resignation from the office of state senator or representative; provide for. Amends secs. 175 & 177 of 1954 PA 116 (MCL 168.175 & 168.177).
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-11-29 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 463 (Y: 35 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-09 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-09 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 32 (Y: 72 N: 36 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-02 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-09 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-09 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 32 (Y: 72 N: 36 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-02 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-12-13 | House | Assigned Pa 192'17 With Immediate Effect |
2017-12-13 | House | Filed With Secretary Of State 12/7/2017 @ 2:24 Pm |
2017-12-13 | House | Approved By The Governor 12/7/2017 @ 11:22 Am |
2017-12-05 | House | Presented To The Governor 12/1/2017 @ 12:57 Pm |
2017-11-29 | House | Bill Ordered Enrolled |
2017-11-29 | House | Full Title Agreed To |
2017-11-29 | House | Returned From Senate Without Amendment With Immediate Effect And Full Title |
2017-11-29 | Senate | Inserted Full Title |
2017-11-29 | Senate | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 463 Yeas 35 Nays 3 Excused 0 Not Voting 0 |
2017-11-28 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading |
2017-11-28 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably Without Amendment(s) |
2017-05-09 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole |
2017-05-09 | Senate | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect |
2017-05-09 | Senate | Reported Favorably Without Amendment |
2017-03-14 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Elections And Government Reform |
2017-03-09 | House | Transmitted |
2017-03-09 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 32 Yeas 72 Nays 36 |
2017-03-09 | House | Read A Third Time |
2017-03-08 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2017-03-08 | House | Read A Second Time |
2017-03-02 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2017-03-02 | House | Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment |
2017-02-15 | House | Bill Electronically Reproduced 02/14/2017 |
2017-02-14 | House | Referred To Committee On Elections And Ethics |
2017-02-14 | House | Read A First Time |
2017-02-14 | House | Introduced By Representative Aaron Miller |