MI HB4207 | 2017-2018 | 99th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 28 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-12-28 - Assigned Pa 239'17 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 28 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-12-28 - Assigned Pa 239'17 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Economic development; development incentives; incentive for certain grocery stores to locate in urban areas; create, and provide funding from the community revitalization program. Amends secs. 90a & 90b of 1984 PA 270 (MCL 125.2090a & 125.2090b).
Title
Economic development; development incentives; incentive for certain grocery stores to locate in urban areas; create, and provide funding from the community revitalization program. Amends secs. 90a & 90b of 1984 PA 270 (MCL 125.2090a & 125.2090b).
Sponsors
Rep. Andy Schor [D] |
Roll Calls
2017-12-13 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 555 (Y: 33 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-12-05 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-11-07 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 377 (Y: 83 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-02 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-2 (Y: 11 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-12-05 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-11-07 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 377 (Y: 83 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-02 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-2 (Y: 11 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-12-28 | House | Assigned Pa 239'17 With Immediate Effect |
2017-12-28 | House | Filed With Secretary Of State 12/21/2017 @ 2:34 Pm |
2017-12-28 | House | Approved By The Governor 12/20/2017 @ 1:12 Pm |
2017-12-28 | House | Presented To The Governor 12/18/2017 @ 11:14 Am |
2017-12-13 | House | Bill Ordered Enrolled |
2017-12-13 | House | Full Title Agreed To |
2017-12-13 | House | Returned From Senate Without Amendment With Immediate Effect And Full Title |
2017-12-13 | Senate | Inserted Full Title |
2017-12-13 | Senate | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 555 Yeas 33 Nays 4 Excused 1 Not Voting 0 |
2017-12-12 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading |
2017-12-12 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably Without Amendment(s) |
2017-12-05 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole |
2017-12-05 | Senate | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect |
2017-12-05 | Senate | Reported Favorably Without Amendment |
2017-11-09 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Economic Development And International Investment |
2017-11-07 | House | Transmitted |
2017-11-07 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 377 Yeas 83 Nays 24 |
2017-11-07 | House | Read A Third Time |
2017-11-02 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2017-11-02 | House | Substitute H-2 Adopted |
2017-11-02 | House | Read A Second Time |
2017-05-02 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2017-05-02 | House | Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-2 |
2017-02-15 | House | Bill Electronically Reproduced 02/14/2017 |
2017-02-14 | House | Referred To Committee On Commerce And Trade |
2017-02-14 | House | Read A First Time |
2017-02-14 | House | Introduced By Representative Andy Schor |