MI HB4206 | 2019-2020 | 100th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Passed on May 14 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-14 - Assigned Pa 11'19 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

School aid; penalties; exception to minimum days of pupil instruction requirement for district closure during a declared state of emergency; provide for. Amends sec. 101 of 1979 PA 94 (MCL 388.1701).

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

School aid; penalties; exception to minimum days of pupil instruction requirement for district closure during a declared state of emergency; provide for. Amends sec. 101 of 1979 PA 94 (MCL 388.1701).

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-02 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Roll Call: Roll Call # 52 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-02 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Roll Call # 52 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-01 - House - House Third Reading: Roll Call # 77 (Y: 56 N: 53 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-30 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 50 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-17 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 51 (Y: 101 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-10 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-3 (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-14HouseAssigned Pa 11'19 With Immediate Effect
2019-05-14HouseFiled With Secretary Of State 05/13/2019 05:28 Pm
2019-05-14HouseApproved By The Governor 05/10/2019 01:27 Pm
2019-05-14HousePresented To The Governor 05/08/2019 02:45 Pm
2019-05-02HouseBill Ordered Enrolled
2019-05-02HouseRe-returned From Senate With Concurrence To House Amendment(s) To Senate Substitute (s-1) And Immediate Effect
2019-05-02SenateGiven Immediate Effect
2019-05-02SenateRoll Call: Roll Call # 52 Yeas 38 Nays 0 Excused 0 Not Voting 0
2019-05-02SenateHouse Amendment(s) To Senate Substitute (s-1) Concurred In
2019-05-02SenateReturned From House With Amendment(s) To Senate Substitute (s-1)
2019-05-01HouseRetransmitted
2019-05-01HouseReps. Brian Elder And Sarah Anthony Removed As Cosponsors
2019-05-01HouseReps. John Cherry, Vanessa Guerra, Ronnie Peterson Removed As Co-sponsors
2019-05-01HouseReps. Darrin Camilleri, Terry Sabo, Nate Shannon Removed As Co-sponsors
2019-05-01HouseFull Title Agreed To
2019-05-01HouseSenate Substitute (s-1) Concurred In As Amended
2019-05-01HouseAmended
2019-04-30HouseLaid Over One Day Under The Rules
2019-04-30HouseReturned From Senate With Substitute (s-1) With Full Title
2019-04-30SenateInserted Full Title
2019-04-30SenateImmediate Effect Defeated
2019-04-30SenatePassed Roll Call # 50 Yeas 38 Nays 0 Excused 0 Not Voting 0
2019-04-30SenateAmendment(s) Defeated
2019-04-30SenatePlaced On Order Of Third Reading With Substitute (s-1)
2019-04-30SenateSubstitute (s-1) Concurred In
2019-04-30SenateReported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably With Substitute (s-1)
2019-04-30SenatePlaced On Order Of General Orders
2019-04-30SenateDischarge Committee Approved
2019-04-18SenateReferred To Committee On Education And Career Readiness
2019-04-17HouseTransmitted
2019-04-17HousePassed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 51 Yeas 101 Nays 7 Excused 0 Not Voting 2
2019-04-17HouseRead A Third Time
2019-04-17HousePlaced On Immediate Passage
2019-04-17HousePlaced On Third Reading
2019-04-17HouseSubstitute (h-3) Adopted And Amended
2019-04-17HouseRead A Second Time
2019-04-10HouseReferred To Second Reading
2019-04-10HouseReported With Recommendation With Substitute (h-3)
2019-03-12HouseReferred To Committee On Ways And Means, With Substitute (h-2)
2019-02-20HouseBill Electronically Reproduced 02/19/2019
2019-02-19HouseReferred To Committee On Education
2019-02-19HouseRead A First Time
2019-02-19HouseIntroduced By Representative Ben Frederick

Subjects


Michigan State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://legislature.mi.gov/doc.aspx?2019-HB-4206
Texthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2019-2020/billintroduced/House/htm/2019-HIB-4206.htm
Texthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2019-2020/billengrossed/House/htm/2019-HEBH-4206.htm
Texthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2019-2020/billengrossed/House/htm/2019-HEBS-4206.htm
Texthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2019-2020/billenrolled/House/htm/2019-HNB-4206.htm
Texthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2019-2020/publicact/htm/2019-PA-0011.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2019-2020/Journal/House/htm/2019-HJ-04-10-032.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2019-2020/Journal/House/htm/2019-HJ-04-17-035.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2019-2020/Journal/Senate/htm/2019-SJ-04-30-040.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2019-2020/Journal/House/htm/2019-HJ-05-01-041.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2019-2020/Journal/Senate/htm/2019-SJ-05-02-042.htm

Bill Comments

feedback