MI HB4203 | 2021-2022 | 101st Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on July 14 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-14 - Assigned Pa 51'21 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Transportation: school vehicles; allowable painting of school buses; modify. Amends sec. 33 of 1990 PA 187 (MCL 257.1833). TIE BAR WITH: HB 4201'21

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Transportation: school vehicles; allowable painting of school buses; modify. Amends sec. 33 of 1990 PA 187 (MCL 257.1833). TIE BAR WITH: HB 4201'21

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-06-24 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 307 (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-06-24 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-20 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 118 (Y: 100 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-23 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-07-14HouseAssigned Pa 51'21 With Immediate Effect
2021-07-14HouseFiled With Secretary Of State 07/13/2021 04:26 Pm
2021-07-14HouseApproved By The Governor 07/13/2021 10:02 Am
2021-06-30HousePresented To The Governor 06/30/2021 01:42 Pm
2021-06-24HouseBill Ordered Enrolled
2021-06-24HouseFull Title Agreed To
2021-06-24HouseReturned From Senate Without Amendment With Immediate Effect And Full Title
2021-06-24SenateInserted Full Title
2021-06-24SenatePassed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 307 Yeas 35 Nays 0 Excused 1 Not Voting 0
2021-06-24SenatePlaced On Immediate Passage
2021-06-24SenateRules Suspended
2021-06-24SenatePlaced On Order Of Third Reading
2021-06-24SenateReported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably Without Amendment(s)
2021-06-24SenateReferred To Committee Of The Whole
2021-06-24SenateCommittee Recommended Immediate Effect
2021-06-24SenateReported Favorably Without Amendment
2021-04-21SenateReferred To Committee On Transportation And Infrastructure
2021-04-20HouseTransmitted
2021-04-20HousePassed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 118 Yeas 100 Nays 9 Excused 0 Not Voting 1
2021-04-20HouseRead A Third Time
2021-04-15HousePlaced On Third Reading
2021-04-15HouseRead A Second Time
2021-03-23HouseReferred To Second Reading
2021-03-23HouseReported With Recommendation Without Amendment
2021-02-11HouseBill Electronically Reproduced 02/10/2021
2021-02-10HouseReferred To Committee On Judiciary
2021-02-10HouseRead A First Time
2021-02-10HouseIntroduced By Representative Jewell Jones

Subjects


Michigan State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://legislature.mi.gov/doc.aspx?2021-HB-4203
Texthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2021-2022/billintroduced/House/htm/2021-HIB-4203.htm
Texthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2021-2022/billengrossed/House/htm/2021-HEBH-4203.htm
Texthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2021-2022/billenrolled/House/htm/2021-HNB-4203.htm
Texthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2021-2022/publicact/htm/2021-PA-0051.htm
Supplementhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2021-2022/billanalysis/House/pdf/2021-HLA-4201-C1B7FA93.pdf
Supplementhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2021-2022/billanalysis/House/pdf/2021-HLA-4201-C2AD427B.pdf
Supplementhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2021-2022/billanalysis/Senate/pdf/2021-SFA-4201-L.pdf
Supplementhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2021-2022/billanalysis/Senate/pdf/2021-SFA-4201-F.pdf
Supplementhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2021-2022/billanalysis/House/pdf/2021-HLA-4201-2B719888.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2021-2022/Journal/House/htm/2021-HJ-03-23-026.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2021-2022/Journal/House/htm/2021-HJ-04-20-032.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2021-2022/Journal/Senate/htm/2021-SJ-06-24-059.htm

Bill Comments 750

feedback