MI HB4203 | 2017-2018 | 99th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 11 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-11 - Assigned Pa 31'17 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 11 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-11 - Assigned Pa 31'17 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
State; identification cards; secretary of state sharing of photographs taken for official state personal identification card with the department of state police; allow. Amends sec. 2 of 1972 PA 222 (MCL 28.292).
Title
State; identification cards; secretary of state sharing of photographs taken for official state personal identification card with the department of state police; allow. Amends sec. 2 of 1972 PA 222 (MCL 28.292).
Sponsors
Rep. Beau LaFave [R] |
Roll Calls
2017-04-27 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 124 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-04-19 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-21 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 51 (Y: 108 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-07 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-19 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-21 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 51 (Y: 108 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-07 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-11 | House | Assigned Pa 31'17 With Immediate Effect |
2017-05-11 | House | Filed With Secretary Of State 5/9/2017 @ 4:16 Pm |
2017-05-11 | House | Approved By The Governor 5/8/2017 @ 4:27 Pm |
2017-05-02 | House | Presented To The Governor 5/2/2017 @ 11:00 Am |
2017-04-27 | House | Bill Ordered Enrolled |
2017-04-27 | House | Returned From Senate Without Amendment With Immediate Effect |
2017-04-27 | Senate | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 124 Yeas 36 Nays 0 Excused 2 Not Voting 0 |
2017-04-26 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading |
2017-04-26 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably Without Amendment(s) |
2017-04-19 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole |
2017-04-19 | Senate | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect |
2017-04-19 | Senate | Reported Favorably Without Amendment |
2017-03-22 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Judiciary |
2017-03-21 | House | Transmitted |
2017-03-21 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 51 Yeas 108 Nays 0 |
2017-03-21 | House | Read A Third Time |
2017-03-16 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2017-03-16 | House | Read A Second Time |
2017-03-07 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2017-03-07 | House | Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment |
2017-02-15 | House | Bill Electronically Reproduced 02/14/2017 |
2017-02-14 | House | Referred To Committee On Judiciary |
2017-02-14 | House | Read A First Time |
2017-02-14 | House | Introduced By Representative Beau Lafave |