MI HB4201 | 2009-2010 | 95th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-1)
Status: Introduced on February 5 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-07-21 - Referred To Committee Of The Whole
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 5 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-07-21 - Referred To Committee Of The Whole
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Natural resources; other; easements across state owned land; revise policy for granting. Amends secs. 2123 & 2124 of 1994 PA 451 (MCL 324.2123 & 324.2124).
Title
Natural resources; other; easements across state owned land; revise policy for granting. Amends secs. 2123 & 2124 of 1994 PA 451 (MCL 324.2123 & 324.2124).
Sponsors
Rep. Richard Ball [R] | Rep. Terry Brown [D] | Rep. Michael Lahti [D] | Rep. Steven Lindberg [D] |
Rep. Gary McDowell [D] | Rep. Gino Polidori [D] | Rep. Sarah Roberts [D] | Rep. Joel Sheltrown [D] |
Roll Calls
2010-02-16 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-07-21 | Referred To Committee Of The Whole | |
2010-07-21 | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect | |
2010-07-21 | Reported Favorably Without Amendment | |
2010-05-26 | Referred To Committee On Natural Resources And Environmental Affairs | |
2010-05-25 | Transmitted | |
2010-05-25 | Title Amended | |
2010-05-25 | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 213 Yeas 106 Nays 0 | |
2010-05-25 | Read A Third Time | |
2010-05-25 | Placed On Immediate Passage | |
2010-05-25 | Placed On Third Reading | |
2010-05-25 | Substitute H-1 Adopted | |
2010-05-25 | Read A Second Time | |
2010-02-16 | Referred To Second Reading | |
2010-02-16 | Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment | |
2009-02-10 | Printed Bill Filed 02/06/2009 | |
2009-02-05 | Referred To Committee On Tourism, Outdoor Recreation And Natural Resources | |
2009-02-05 | Read A First Time | |
2009-02-05 | Introduced By Representative Steven Lindberg |