MI HB4195 | 2021-2022 | 101st Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 17 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-08-17 - Assigned Pa 175'22 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 17 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-08-17 - Assigned Pa 175'22 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Family law: marriage and divorce; public disclosure of divorce filings; modify. Amends 1846 RS 84 (MCL 552.1 - 552.45) by adding sec. 6a.
Title
Family law: marriage and divorce; public disclosure of divorce filings; modify. Amends 1846 RS 84 (MCL 552.1 - 552.45) by adding sec. 6a.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-06-30 - House - House Third Reading: Roll Call # 350 (Y: 103 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-30 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 391 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-30 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-2 (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-16 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 49 (Y: 104 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-25 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-30 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 391 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-30 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-2 (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-16 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 49 (Y: 104 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-25 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-08-17 | House | Assigned Pa 175'22 With Immediate Effect |
2022-08-17 | House | Filed With Secretary Of State 07/21/2022 11:26 Am |
2022-08-17 | House | Approved By The Governor 07/21/2022 10:02 Am |
2022-07-20 | House | Presented To The Governor 07/11/2022 12:38 Pm |
2022-06-30 | House | Bill Ordered Enrolled |
2022-06-30 | House | Roll Call Roll Call # 350 Yeas 103 Nays 3 Excused 0 Not Voting 4 |
2022-06-30 | House | Senate Substitute (s-3) Concurred In |
2022-06-30 | House | Rule Suspended |
2022-06-30 | House | Laid Over One Day Under The Rules |
2022-06-30 | House | Returned From Senate With Substitute (s-3) With Immediate Effect |
2022-06-30 | Senate | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 391 Yeas 38 Nays 0 Excused 0 Not Voting 0 |
2022-06-30 | Senate | Placed On Immediate Passage |
2022-06-30 | Senate | Rules Suspended |
2022-06-30 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading With Substitute (s-3) |
2022-06-30 | Senate | Substitute (s-3) Concurred In |
2022-06-30 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably With Substitute (s-3) |
2022-06-30 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole With Substitute (s-2) |
2022-06-30 | Senate | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect |
2022-06-30 | Senate | Reported Favorably With Substitute (s-2) |
2022-02-17 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Judiciary And Public Safety |
2022-02-16 | House | Transmitted |
2022-02-16 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 49 Yeas 104 Nays 0 Excused 0 Not Voting 2 |
2022-02-16 | House | Read A Third Time |
2022-02-10 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2022-02-10 | House | Substitute (h-1) Adopted And Amended |
2022-02-10 | House | Read A Second Time |
2022-01-25 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2022-01-25 | House | Reported With Recommendation With Substitute (h-1) |
2021-02-11 | House | Bill Electronically Reproduced 02/10/2021 |
2021-02-10 | House | Referred To Committee On Judiciary |
2021-02-10 | House | Read A First Time |
2021-02-10 | House | Introduced By Representative Pamela Hornberger |