MI HB4187 | 2019-2020 | 100th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Enrolled on December 16 2020 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-12-31 - Pocket Veto 01/05/2021
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Enrolled on December 16 2020 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-12-31 - Pocket Veto 01/05/2021
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Trade: data security; data breach notification act; enact. Creates new act. TIE BAR WITH: HB 4186'19
Title
Trade: data security; data breach notification act; enact. Creates new act. TIE BAR WITH: HB 4186'19
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-12-16 - House - House Third Reading: Roll Call # 543 (Y: 93 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-12-10 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 541 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-12-03 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-09-02 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 349 (Y: 97 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-12-10 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-13 - House - Reported With Recommendation For Referral To Committee On Ways And Means (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-12-10 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 541 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-12-03 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-09-02 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 349 (Y: 97 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-12-10 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-13 - House - Reported With Recommendation For Referral To Committee On Ways And Means (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-12-31 | House | Pocket Veto 01/05/2021 |
2020-12-23 | House | Presented To The Governor 12/22/2020 06:47 Pm |
2020-12-16 | House | Bill Ordered Enrolled |
2020-12-16 | House | Title Amendment Agreed To |
2020-12-16 | House | Roll Call Roll Call # 543 Yeas 93 Nays 15 Excused 0 Not Voting 2 |
2020-12-16 | House | Senate Substitute (s-1) Concurred In |
2020-12-15 | House | Laid Over One Day Under The Rules |
2020-12-15 | House | Returned From Senate With Substitute (s-1) With Title Amendment |
2020-12-10 | Senate | Passed Roll Call # 541 Yeas 38 Nays 0 Excused 0 Not Voting 0 |
2020-12-10 | Senate | Placed On Immediate Passage |
2020-12-10 | Senate | Rules Suspended |
2020-12-10 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading With Substitute (s-1) |
2020-12-10 | Senate | Substitute (s-1) Concurred In |
2020-12-10 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably With Substitute (s-1) |
2020-12-03 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole With Substitute (s-1) |
2020-12-03 | Senate | Reported Favorably With Substitute (s-1) |
2020-09-09 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Regulatory Reform |
2020-09-02 | House | Transmitted |
2020-09-02 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 349 Yeas 97 Nays 12 Excused 0 Not Voting 0 |
2020-09-02 | House | Read A Third Time |
2020-09-01 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2020-09-01 | House | Substitute (h-7) Adopted |
2020-09-01 | House | Read A Second Time |
2019-12-10 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2019-12-10 | House | Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment |
2019-03-13 | House | Referred To Committee On Ways And Means |
2019-02-14 | House | Bill Electronically Reproduced 02/14/2019 |
2019-02-14 | House | Referred To Committee On Financial Services |
2019-02-14 | House | Read A First Time |
2019-02-14 | House | Introduced By Representative Diana Farrington |
Subjects
Consumer protection: other
Consumer protection: privacy
Crimes: identity theft
State agencies (existing): attorney general
Trade: data security
Consumer protection: privacy
Crimes: identity theft
State agencies (existing): attorney general
Trade: data security