MI HB4186 | 2017-2018 | 99th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 16 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-08-16 - Assigned Pa 84'17 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 16 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-08-16 - Assigned Pa 84'17 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Animals; animal shelters; certain definition of animal; revise. Amends secs. 1 & 8b of 1969 PA 287 (MCL 287.331 & 287.338b).
Title
Animals; animal shelters; certain definition of animal; revise. Amends secs. 1 & 8b of 1969 PA 287 (MCL 287.331 & 287.338b).
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-06-22 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 307 (Y: 36 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-06-13 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-01 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 7 (Y: 100 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-22 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-13 - Senate - Reported Favorably Without Amendment (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-01 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 7 (Y: 100 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-22 - House - Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-08-16 | House | Assigned Pa 84'17 With Immediate Effect |
2017-08-16 | House | Filed With Secretary Of State 7/12/2017 @ 1:04 Pm |
2017-08-16 | House | Approved By The Governor 7/12/2017 @ 10:47 Am |
2017-07-12 | House | Presented To The Governor 6/29/2017 @ 2:42 Pm |
2017-07-12 | House | Bill Ordered Enrolled 06/22/2017 |
2017-07-12 | House | Returned From Senate Without Amendment With Immediate Effect |
2017-06-22 | Senate | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 307 Yeas 36 Nays 1 Excused 1 Not Voting 0 |
2017-06-21 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading |
2017-06-21 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably Without Amendment(s) |
2017-06-13 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole |
2017-06-13 | Senate | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect |
2017-06-13 | Senate | Reported Favorably Without Amendment |
2017-03-07 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Agriculture |
2017-03-01 | House | Transmitted |
2017-03-01 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 7 Yeas 100 Nays 8 |
2017-03-01 | House | Read A Third Time |
2017-02-28 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2017-02-28 | House | Read A Second Time |
2017-02-22 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2017-02-22 | House | Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment |
2017-02-14 | House | Bill Electronically Reproduced 02/09/2017 |
2017-02-09 | House | Referred To Committee On Agriculture |
2017-02-09 | House | Read A First Time |
2017-02-09 | House | Introduced By Representative Julie Alexander |