MI HB4184 | 2017-2018 | 99th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 31 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-06-06 - Referred To Committee On Elections And Government Reform
Pending: Senate Elections And Government Reform Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 31 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-06-06 - Referred To Committee On Elections And Government Reform
Pending: Senate Elections And Government Reform Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Civil rights; open meetings; physical presence required for vote; clarify. Amends sec. 3 of 1976 PA 267 (MCL 15.263).
Title
Civil rights; open meetings; physical presence required for vote; clarify. Amends sec. 3 of 1976 PA 267 (MCL 15.263).
Sponsors
Sen. Lana Theis [R] |
Roll Calls
2017-05-31 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 165 (Y: 96 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-27 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-27 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-06 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Elections And Government Reform |
2017-05-31 | House | Transmitted |
2017-05-31 | House | Title Amended |
2017-05-31 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 165 Yeas 96 Nays 12 |
2017-05-31 | House | Read A Third Time |
2017-05-30 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2017-05-30 | House | Substitute H-1 Adopted And Amended |
2017-05-30 | House | Read A Second Time |
2017-04-27 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2017-04-27 | House | Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 |
2017-02-14 | House | Bill Electronically Reproduced 02/09/2017 |
2017-02-09 | House | Referred To Committee On Oversight |
2017-02-09 | House | Read A First Time |
2017-02-09 | House | Introduced By Representative Lana Theis |