MI HB4181 | 2019-2020 | 100th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on December 11 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-08 - Referred To Committee On Transportation And Infrastructure
Pending: Senate Transportation And Infrastructure Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on December 11 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-08 - Referred To Committee On Transportation And Infrastructure
Pending: Senate Transportation And Infrastructure Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Traffic control: violations; penalties for operating a vehicle while sending or receiving a message on an electronic wireless device; enhance. Amends secs. 320a, 602b, 602c & 732 of 1949 PA 300 (MCL 257.320a et seq.).
Title
Traffic control: violations; penalties for operating a vehicle while sending or receiving a message on an electronic wireless device; enhance. Amends secs. 320a, 602b, 602c & 732 of 1949 PA 300 (MCL 257.320a et seq.).
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-12-11 - House - House Third Reading: Passed Roll Call # 357 (Y: 87 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-12-05 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-12-05 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-08 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Transportation And Infrastructure |
2019-12-11 | House | Transmitted |
2019-12-11 | House | Title Amended |
2019-12-11 | House | Passed Roll Call # 357 Yeas 87 Nays 21 Excused 0 Not Voting 1 |
2019-12-11 | House | Read A Third Time |
2019-12-11 | House | Placed On Immediate Passage |
2019-12-11 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2019-12-11 | House | Substitute (h-1) Adopted |
2019-12-11 | House | Read A Second Time |
2019-12-05 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2019-12-05 | House | Reported With Recommendation With Substitute (h-1) |
2019-05-02 | House | Referred To Committee On Ways And Means, With Substitute (h-1) |
2019-02-13 | House | Bill Electronically Reproduced 02/13/2019 |
2019-02-13 | House | Referred To Committee On Transportation |
2019-02-13 | House | Read A First Time |
2019-02-13 | House | Introduced By Representative Mari Manoogian |