MI HB4170 | 2017-2018 | 99th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on November 9 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-11-09 - Assigned Pa 154'17 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on November 9 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-11-09 - Assigned Pa 154'17 With Immediate Effect
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Health; other; physician orders for scope of treatment forms; allow. Amends sec. 20919 of 1978 PA 368 (MCL 333.20919) & adds pt. 56B & sec. 20192a. TIE BAR WITH: HB 4171'17, HB 4173'17, HB 4174'17
Title
Health; other; physician orders for scope of treatment forms; allow. Amends sec. 20919 of 1978 PA 368 (MCL 333.20919) & adds pt. 56B & sec. 20192a. TIE BAR WITH: HB 4171'17, HB 4173'17, HB 4174'17
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-11-01 - House - House Third Reading: Roll Call # 337 (Y: 107 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-10-31 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 430 (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-10-11 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-20 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 244 (Y: 106 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-14 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-10-31 - Senate - Senate Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 430 (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-10-11 - Senate - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-20 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 244 (Y: 106 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-14 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-11-09 | House | Assigned Pa 154'17 With Immediate Effect |
2017-11-09 | House | Filed With Secretary Of State 11/8/2017 @ 4:26 Pm |
2017-11-09 | House | Approved By The Governor 11/8/2017 @ 11:54 Am |
2017-11-07 | House | Presented To The Governor 11/6/2017 @ 3:13 Pm |
2017-11-01 | House | Bill Ordered Enrolled |
2017-11-01 | House | Full Title Agreed To |
2017-11-01 | House | Roll Call # 337 Yeas 107 Nays 1 |
2017-11-01 | House | Senate Substitute S-1 Concurred In |
2017-10-31 | House | Laid Over One Day Under The Rules |
2017-10-31 | House | Returned From Senate With Substitute S-1 With Immediate Effect And Full Title |
2017-10-31 | Senate | Inserted Full Title |
2017-10-31 | Senate | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 430 Yeas 35 Nays 0 Excused 3 Not Voting 0 |
2017-10-31 | Senate | Amendment(s) Defeated |
2017-10-19 | Senate | Placed On Order Of Third Reading With Substitute S-1 As Amended |
2017-10-19 | Senate | Substitute S-1 As Amended Concurred In |
2017-10-19 | Senate | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably With Substitute S-1 And Amendment(s) |
2017-10-11 | Senate | Referred To Committee Of The Whole With Substitute S-1 |
2017-10-11 | Senate | Committee Recommended Immediate Effect |
2017-10-11 | Senate | Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 |
2017-06-21 | Senate | Referred To Committee On Health Policy |
2017-06-20 | House | Transmitted |
2017-06-20 | House | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 244 Yeas 106 Nays 1 |
2017-06-20 | House | Read A Third Time |
2017-06-20 | House | Placed On Immediate Passage |
2017-06-20 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2017-06-20 | House | Substitute H-1 Adopted |
2017-06-20 | House | Read A Second Time |
2017-06-14 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2017-06-14 | House | Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 |
2017-02-08 | House | Bill Electronically Reproduced 02/07/2017 |
2017-02-07 | House | Referred To Committee On Health Policy |
2017-02-07 | House | Read A First Time |
2017-02-07 | House | Introduced By Representative Jim Tedder |
Subjects
Health facilities: other
Health occupations: health professionals
Health occupations: physicians
Health: other
Health: planning
State agencies (existing): health and human services
Health occupations: health professionals
Health occupations: physicians
Health: other
Health: planning
State agencies (existing): health and human services