MI HB4169 | 2023-2024 | 102nd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 26-9)
Status: Introduced on March 2 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-18 - Placed On Third Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 2 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-18 - Placed On Third Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Health occupations: occupational therapists; occupational therapy licensure compact; enact. Amends 1978 PA 368 (MCL 333.1101 - 333.25211) by adding sec. 16188. TIE BAR WITH: HB 4170'23
Title
Health occupations: occupational therapists; occupational therapy licensure compact; enact. Amends 1978 PA 368 (MCL 333.1101 - 333.25211) by adding sec. 16188. TIE BAR WITH: HB 4170'23
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-10-12 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-18 | House | Placed On Third Reading |
2024-04-18 | House | Substitute (h-1) Adopted |
2024-04-18 | House | Read A Second Time |
2023-10-12 | House | Referred To Second Reading |
2023-10-12 | House | Reported With Recommendation With Substitute (h-1) |
2023-03-07 | House | Bill Electronically Reproduced 03/02/2023 |
2023-03-02 | House | Referred To Committee On Health Policy |
2023-03-02 | House | Read A First Time |
2023-03-02 | House | Introduced By Representative Julie M. Rogers |
Same As/Similar To
HB4170 (Same As) 2024-04-18 - Placed On Third Reading
Subjects
Health occupations: occupational therapists
Occupations: individual licensing and registration
State agencies (existing): licensing and regulatory affairs
State: interstate compacts and agreements
Occupations: individual licensing and registration
State agencies (existing): licensing and regulatory affairs
State: interstate compacts and agreements