MI HB4167 | 2021-2022 | 101st Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-2)
Status: Introduced on February 9 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-05-27 - Referred To Committee On Rules And Competitiveness
Pending: House Rules And Competitiveness Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Education: safety; annual inspections of all public and nonpublic schools for health and safety violations; require. Amends 1976 PA 451 (MCL 380.1 - 380.1852) by adding sec. 1263a.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Education: safety; annual inspections of all public and nonpublic schools for health and safety violations; require. Amends 1976 PA 451 (MCL 380.1 - 380.1852) by adding sec. 1263a.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-04-13 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 (Y: 8 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-05-27HouseReferred To Committee On Rules And Competitiveness
2021-05-13HousePlaced On Third Reading
2021-05-13HouseSubstitute (h-1) Adopted
2021-05-13HouseRead A Second Time
2021-04-13HouseReferred To Second Reading
2021-04-13HouseReported With Recommendation With Substitute (h-1)
2021-02-10HouseBill Electronically Reproduced 02/09/2021
2021-02-09HouseReferred To Committee On Education
2021-02-09HouseRead A First Time
2021-02-09HouseIntroduced By Representative Ryan Berman

Subjects


Michigan State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback